This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/20/2019 at 23:01:56 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL VS SIOUX CHIEF MFG CO

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SIOUX CHIEF MFG CO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1345

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP

Defendant

SIOUX CHIEF MFG. CO, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILLEMER & PILLEMER

17835 Ventura Blvd., Suite 204

Encino, CA 91316

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP SERVED ON SIOUX CHIEF MFG. CO, INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/10/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF OSC HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL.

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF STATE

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF OSC HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 9/16/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT SUBMITTED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP SERVED ON SIOUX CHIEF MFG. CO, INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/10/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/08/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIOUX CHIEF MFG CO INC (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH THE TEXAS is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant