Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 22:50:11 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE VS IRVING

Case Summary

On 10/31/2014 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against IRVING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1084

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP

Defendant

BRANDON IRVING

Desert Hot Springs, CA 92240

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILLEMER & PILLEMER

17835 Ventura Blvd Ste 204

Encino, CA 91316

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (BANNING)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: AS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPA

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 11. (COMMISSIONER)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP SERVED ON BRANDON IRVING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/09/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/3

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP BY BRANDON IRVING REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BRANDON IRVING IS GRANTED; CLERK CMUNDO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SETT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP.

ORDER AND JUDGMENT

ORDER AND JUDGMENT

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ENTR

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FI

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2024
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $979.00 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: WRIT OF EXECUTION SUBMITTED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTI OF OSC HRG AS TO RTN TO SEND; REASON RETURNED: NOT DEL AS ADD UNABLE TO FRWD BRANDON IRVING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP BY BRANDON IRVING REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP SERVED ON BRANDON IRVING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/09/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 11. (COMMISSIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 5/01/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant