This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 22:39:45 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO/INS CO VS HENEGAR

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO/INS CO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HENEGAR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4378

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Defendants

CAMDY HENEGAR

JAMIE ALEXIS HENEGAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLERKIN SINCLAIR & MAHFOUZ, LLP

Attorney at CLERKIN SINCLAIR & MAHFOUZ, LLP

530 B St., 8Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARDSON, FAIR & COHEN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICHARDSON, FAIR & COHEN

Willis Jackson King, III

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

11/06/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Notice of Department Assignment

09/24/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference

09/24/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference

Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement (ADR-100)

09/21/2021: Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement (ADR-100)

Notice of Reassignment of Court Mediator

06/23/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Court Mediator

Notice of Reassignment of Court Mediator

05/20/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Court Mediator

Notice of Court Assigned Mediator

05/04/2021: Notice of Court Assigned Mediator

Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

04/08/2021: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

04/06/2021: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

Case Management Statement

03/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer to Complaint on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

11/12/2020: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Demand for Jury Trial

11/12/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

11/06/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

System Generated Notice re: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

10/09/2020: System Generated Notice re: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92879.

09/30/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92879.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference (Notice); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement (ADR-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference (Notice); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Reassignment of Court Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Reassignment of Court Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE; Filed By: JAMIE ALEXIS HENEGAR; CAMDY HENEGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/08/2020; Fine Description: Check #157376 Receipt No.: CV201009-0011-CK.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92879.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Corona)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant