This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/09/2016 at 20:15:38 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL VS EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2015 STATE FARM GENERAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1657

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC

TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC

SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC

SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC

AAA BEACH POOL SERVICE

FERRAUD INDUSTRIESINC

ROES 1 TO 20

AAA BEACH POOL SERVICE LLC

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

ROES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATKINS & LETOFSKY

4040 Macarthur Blvd., Ste. 240

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

21804 Cactus Ave #200

Riverside, CA 92518-3010

CLOUSESPANIAC ATTORNEY S

8038 Haven Avenue #E

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

CIHIGOYENETCHE GROSSBERG & CLOUSE

8038 Haven Avenue Suite E

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

RYAN CARVALHO & WHITE LLP

8989 Rio San Diego Dr Ste 368

San Diego, CA 92108

ARCHER NORRIS

777 S. Figueroa St #4250

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY AS TO SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC; MAILING DATE OF 04/16/15 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY AS TO EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC; MAILING DATE OF 04/22/15 FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SENTINEL HY

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC REPRESENTED BY RYAN CARVALHO & WHITE LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC FILED.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF ADVANCE J

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES BY EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING MO

NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 1ST AMENDED FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/12/2015 OF TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC BY EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC REPRESENTED BY WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY BY SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC REPRESENTED BY RYAN CARVALHO & WHITE LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASI

STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/12/2015 OF TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC AS TO SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2016 OF SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC NAMING ROES/MOES 001 TO BE AAA BEACH POOL SERVICE LLC FILED

DECLARATION OF NORMAN A. RYAN

DECLARATION OF NORMAN A. RYAN IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2016 OF SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC BY TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC REPRESENTED BY CIHIGOYENETCHE GROSSBERG & CLOUSE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J ESCHE

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J ESCHENBURG ESZ IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING OF 6/20/16 FILED

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/12/2015 OF TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC BY SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC REPRESENTED BY RYAN CARVALHO & WHITE LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2016 OF SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC SERVED ON AAA BEACH POOL SERVICE LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/21/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2015 OF SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC AS TO AAA BEACH POOL SERVICE LLC FILED.

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC, TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC, SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC, SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC/WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2016 OF SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC NAMING DOES 5 TO BE FERRAUD INDUSTRIESINC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: TSC 07-27-16 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2016 OF SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC AS TO AAA BEACH POOL SERVICE LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • FAX FILING BY EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2015 OF EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC AS TO AAA BEACH POOL SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC, TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC, SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC, SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC/WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/12/2015 OF TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC AS TO FERRAUD INDUSTRIESINC; MAILING DATE OF 07/22/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY NAMING DOES 1 TO BE SENTINEL HYDROSOLUTIONS LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY BY TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC REPRESENTED BY CIHIGOYENETCHE GROSSBERG & CLOUSE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY AS TO EZ-FLO INTERNATIONAL INC; MAILING DATE OF 04/22/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/15/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY AS TO SOUTHWEST PLUMBINGINC; MAILING DATE OF 04/16/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92211.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOMMY ROOTER PLUMBING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EZ Flo International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant