Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/04/2016 at 04:56:52 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INS VS CHAMBERLAIN BACKHOE

Case Summary

On 10/31/2007 STATE COMPENSATION INS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHAMBERLAIN BACKHOE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4382

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEVEN LAWSON

STATE COMPENSATIONINSURANCE FUND

900 Corporate Center Drive 3Rd Floor

Monterey Park, CA 91754-7618

Defendants

JOHN MCDANIEL

CHAMBERLAIN BACKHOE SERVICE

Not Classified By Court

RIC485973

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN F STEWART

373 East Rowland Street

Covina, CA 91723

Defendant Attorneys

SELMAN - BREITMAN LLP

11766 Wilshire Blvd Sixth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6538

SELMAN - BREITMAN,LLP

101 W. Broadway, Ste. 1330

San Diego, CA 92101-8214

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATIONINSURANCE FUND

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STEVEN LAWSON

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TSC FI

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TSC FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY JOHN MCDANIEL.

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PA

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION BY JOHN MCDANIEL FILED

DECLARATION OF OF DENNIS M. AL

DECLARATION OF OF DENNIS M. ALEXANDER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE FILED. FILED

DECLARATION OF OF DENNIS M ALE

DECLARATION OF OF DENNIS M ALEXANDERIN SUPPORT OF MTN TO CNTINUE TRIAL, REOPEN EXPERT DISCOVERY FILED BY JOHN MCDAN FILED

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FI

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2007 OF STATE COMPENSATIONINSURANCE FUND BY JOHN MCDANIEL FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO APPLICA

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING AMENDMENT BY JOHN MCDANIEL FILED

PLAINTIFFS 2ND AMENDED EXHIBIT

PLAINTIFFS 2ND AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

PLAINTIFFS AMENDED EXHIBIT LIS

PLAINTIFFS AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF THE CA

DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF THE CASE FILED.

DEFENDANTS WITNESS LIST FILED.

DEFENDANTS WITNESS LIST FILED.

DEFENDANTS TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

DEFENDANTS TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT TEST

MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT TESTIMONY OF EXPERTS BY DEFENDANTS FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REFU

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REFUND OF MONIES ON DEPOSIT FILED BY JOHN MCDANIEL IS GRANTED HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK (FORM RI-P01).

JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILE

JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2007 OF STATE COMPENSATIONINSURANCE FUND FILED .

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2012
  • TRUST VOID - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • POST UNCLAIMED - JURY DEPOSIT CCP 631.3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • TRUST EXONERATION - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • TRUST EXONERATION - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2007 OF STEVEN LAWSON SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 08/29/12.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$21,017.69 BY STEVEN LAWSON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO SELMAN BREITMAN DOC#1904652530, IN THE AMOUNT OF $259.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY STEVEN LAWSON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • REQUEST FOR REFUND SUBMITTED TO ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • REFUND RECEIPT#: 201207090194 FOR THE AMOUNT OF $259.00 MADE PAYABLE TO SELMAN BREITMAN LLP; MAILING ADDRESS: 11766 WILSHIRE BLVD LOS ANGELES CA 90025

    Read MoreRead Less
161 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2007
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # RIC485973 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2007 OF STATE COMPENSATIONINSURANCE FUND SERVED ON CHAMBERLAIN BACKHOESERVICE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/07/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2007 OF STATE COMPENSATIONINSURANCE FUND NAMING DOES 1 TO BE JOHN MCDANIEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION BY STATE COMPENSATIONINSURANCE FUND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/08/08 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAMBERLAIN BACKHOE SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant