Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 14:50:48 (UTC).

STARLITE MGMT II LP VS SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/31/2014 STARLITE MGMT II LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0783

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARLITE MGMT II LP

Defendants

SHELDON KEITH SMITH

Banning, CA 92220

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2014 OF STARLITE MGMT II LP BY SHELDON KEITH SMITH REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD-105) ON H.G.LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/05/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY SHELDON KEITH SMITH IS GRANTED; CLERK BA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2014 OF STARLITE MGMT II LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 07/31/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2014 OF STARLITE MGMT II LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SHELDON KEITH SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/31/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2014 OF STARLITE MGMT II LP AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STARLITE MGMT II LP - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGM

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 08/27/14; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STARLITE MGMT II LP.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATSIFIED FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATSIFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STARLITE MGMT II LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 08/27/14; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 8/27/14, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STARLITE MGMT II LP - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2014 OF STARLITE MGMT II LP AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SHELDON KEITH SMITH (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2014 OF STARLITE MGMT II LP BY SHELDON KEITH SMITH REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/29/14 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STARLITE MGMT II, LP is a litigant