This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/21/2022 at 19:58:27 (UTC).

STALLWORTH vs LIFE CARE CENTERS OF AMERICA INC.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 STALLWORTH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIFE CARE CENTERS OF AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0709

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DORA STALLWORTH

SHELDON STALLWORTH

FLOYD STALLWORTH

STEPHANIE MONDRAGON

Defendants

SILVERSCREEN HEALTHCARE INC

KND DEVELOPMENT 54 LLC

LIFE CARE CENTERS OF AMERICA INC.

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING LLC

KINDRED HOSPITAL RIVERSIDE

SHAWN STALLWORTH

MICHAEL STALLWORTH

ASISTENCIA VILLA REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER

LIFE CARE CENTER OF MENIFEE

CRYSTAL SOLORZANO

RENEW HEALTH CONSULTING SERVICES LLC

FLOYD STALLWORTH, JR

RODGER GROVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brent Lee Moss WILLIAM ARTIGLIERE

Defendant Attorneys

Tiffany Anne Le Melle

Alexander F. Giovanniello JENNY T NGUYEN

Dan Scott Barber

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

07/08/2022: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

Defendants, Silverscreen Health Care, INC. dba Asistencia Villa Rehabilitation and Care Center and Renew Health Consulting Services, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Dama

08/01/2022: Defendants, Silverscreen Health Care, INC. dba Asistencia Villa Rehabilitation and Care Center and Renew Health Consulting Services, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

07/08/2022: Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

07/08/2022: Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

07/08/2022: Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

07/08/2022: Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

Notice of Document Return.

07/08/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

07/08/2022: Request for Dismissal on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

Notice of Document Return.

07/07/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

07/06/2022: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

07/06/2022: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

06/22/2022: Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

Certificate of Mailing

06/01/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

06/01/2022: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

06/06/2022: Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

06/06/2022: Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

04/06/2022: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

03/24/2022: Case Management Statement on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH

328 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220802-00514.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendants, Silverscreen Health Care, INC. dba Asistencia Villa Rehabilitation and Care Center and Renew Health Consulting Services, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH; Filed By: SILVERSCREEN HEALTHCARE INC; RENEW HEALTH CONSULTING SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/08/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220708-01139.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 2nd Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH; Filed By: FLOYD STALLWORTH; DORA STALLWORTH; STEPHANIE MONDRAGON; SHELDON STALLWORTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
503 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FLOYD STALLWORTH; Filed By: FLOYD STALLWORTH; DORA STALLWORTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/26/2021; Fine Description: Check #D3813296 Receipt No.: 20210126-00850.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES; Filed By: FLOYD STALLWORTH; DORA STALLWORTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/12/2021; Fine Description: Check #D36811773 Receipt No.: 20210112-00380.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: FLOYD STALLWORTH; DORA STALLWORTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: FLOYD STALLWORTH; DORA STALLWORTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: FLOYD STALLWORTH; DORA STALLWORTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT (WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE 15600) & VIOLATION OF RESIDENT'S BILL OF RIGHTS; Filed By: FLOYD STALLWORTH; DORA STALLWORTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less