This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 15:36:00 (UTC).

STACI OSWALD VS THE RIVER AT RANCHO MIRAGE

Case Summary

On 07/03/2014 STACI OSWALD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE RIVER AT RANCHO MIRAGE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3593

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STACI OSWALD

Defendants and Cross Defendants

THE RIVER AT RANCHO MIRAGE

RANCHO MIRAGE RIVER

RANCHO MIRAGE RIVER LLC

JH SNYDER COMPANY

CB RICHARD ELLIS

GROSVENOR USA LIMITED

GROSVENOR INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY

THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

CHEESECAKE FACTORYRESTAURANTSINC

THE RIVER RETAIL LLC

THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC. A

CHEER LAND THE RIVER LP

CB RICHARD ELLIS INC

ROES 1 THROUGH 200

SHAWMUT WOODWORKING & SUPPLY INC

SHAWMUT DESIGN ANDCONSTRUCTION INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC. A

SHAWMUT WOODWORKING & SUPPLY INC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GERALD L MARCUS

24025 Park Sorrento Ste 430

Calabasas, CA 91302

LAW OFFICES OF BRADLEY S WALLACE

16000 Ventura Blvd #400

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF TRACEY LAZARUS

17901 Von Karman Ave Ste 300

Irvine, CA 92614

MARSHALL & FRENCH

17901 Von Karman Ave Ste 300

Irvine, CA 92614

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER

801 South Figueroa Street 15Th Floor At 801 Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90017

JACKS & MAYBAUM LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd #975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

JACKS & MAYBAUM LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd #975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/20/2016 OF THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC. A NAMING ROES/MOES 1 TO BE SHAWMUT DESIGN ANDCONSTRUCTIONINC FILED

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/20/2016 OF THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC. A BY SHAWMUT WOODWORKING& SUPPLY INC REPRESENTED BY JACKS & MAYBAUM LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF JANE E RANDOLPH

DECLARATION OF JANE E RANDOLPH TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES SPECIAL & FORM INTERROG OFF CALENDAR FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TO C

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T LATTING.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DA

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL BY SHAWMUT WOODWORKING& SUPPLY INC FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD AS TO DEFENDANT THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD SERVED ON CB RICHARD ELLIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/18/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY STACI

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY STACI OSWALD FILED

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD NAMING DOES 2 TO BE CHEER LAND THE RIVER LP FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD BY GROSVENOR USA LIMITED, THE RIVER RETAIL LLC REPRESENTED BY MARSHALL & FRENCH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE IMPROPER

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE IMPROPER DOE AMENDMENT AND DISMISS COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD SERVED ON THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/18/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE IMPROPER DOE AMENDMENT BY STACI OSWALD FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY G

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY GROSVENOR USA LIMITED FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE IMPROPER

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE IMPROPER DOE AMENDMENT BY DOES 1 THROUGH 100 FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY C

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CB RICHARD ELLIS INC, THE RIVER RETAIL LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • FAX FILING BY SHAWMUT WOODWORKING& SUPPLY INC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL BY SHAWMUT WOODWORKING& SUPPLY INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION SUBMITTED BY STACI OSWALD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OSC RE DISMISSAL 08/03/2017 ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/10/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD SERVED ON RANCHO MIRAGE RIVERLLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD SERVED ON CB RICHARD ELLIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/18/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD SERVED ON THE RIVER AT RANCHOMIRAGE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD SERVED ON RANCHO MIRAGE RIVER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD SERVED ON JH SNYDER COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF STACI OSWALD AS TO DEFENDANT THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less