This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 19:17:12 (UTC).

SPSSM VS RODRIGUEZ/VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 SPSSM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ/VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1631

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPSSM INVESTMENTS

Defendants

JOANA VASQUEZ

ANTONIO VASQUEZ

VIRGINIA RODRIGUEZ

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GLENN R TRAVIS

4294 Orange St

Riverside, CA 92501

JOHN E BOUZANE & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92583.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS BY VIRGINIA RODRIGUEZ, JOANA VASQUEZ, ANTONIO VASQUEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON GLENN R TRAVIS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/25/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY VIRGINIA RODRIGUEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ANTONIO VASQUEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JOANA VASQUEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS SERVED ON JOANA VASQUEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/20/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS SERVED ON VIRGINIA RODRIGUEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/20/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS SERVED ON ANTONIO VASQUEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/20/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SPSSM INVESTMENTS - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/20/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SPSSM INVESTMENTS.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/14/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF GLENN R TRAVIS FOR PARTY(S) SPSSM INVESTMENTS AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY JOHN E BOUZANE & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 09/14/16; SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/14/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SPSSM INVESTMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (HEMET) SET; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/20/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS BY VIRGINIA RODRIGUEZ, JOANA VASQUEZ, ANTONIO VASQUEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92583.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/17/16 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2016 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPSSM Investments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF GLENN R TRAVIS