This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 20:17:07 (UTC).

SPSSM INVESTMENTS VS VALADEZ

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 SPSSM INVESTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VALADEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1393

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP

Defendant

ROSALINI VALADEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLENN R TRAVIS

4294 Orange St.

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Southwest)

02/14/2020: Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Southwest)

Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

02/14/2020: Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP and filed.

02/14/2020: Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.

02/14/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

02/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Application and Order for Posting and Mailing of Summons & Complaint; Honorable Commissioner Candice Garcia-Rodrigo filed.

02/27/2020: Application and Order for Posting and Mailing of Summons & Complaint; Honorable Commissioner Candice Garcia-Rodrigo filed.

Request for Dismissal Without prejudice Entire Action filed

10/19/2020: Request for Dismissal Without prejudice Entire Action filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal Without prejudice Entire Action filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Posting and Mailing of Summons & Complaint; Honorable Commissioner Candice Garcia-Rodrigo filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/25/2020; Fine Description: Check #5305 Receipt No.: CV200225-0516-CK.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFilings: Unlawful Detainer Complaint of SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper in unlawful detainer amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $270.00; Paid: $270.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/13/2020; Fine Description: Check #5281 Receipt No.: CV200214-0790-CK.1; Paid: $270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPSSM Investments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF GLENN R TRAVIS