Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/13/2018 at 11:23:01 (UTC).

SONIFI SOLUTIONS VS HWY 111 HOTEL GROUP

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 SONIFI SOLUTIONS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HWY 111 HOTEL GROUP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3333

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

JSC HOSPITALITY INVESTMENT INC

HWY 111 HOTEL GROUP LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

106 South Mentor Ave Ste 150

Pasadena, CA 91106

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/16/18 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 06/05/2018 OF SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC AS TO JSC HOSPITALITY INVESTMENT INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 06/05/2018 OF SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC AS TO HWY 111 HOTEL GROUPLP; MAILING DATE OF 07/11/18 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 06/05/2018 OF SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC SERVED ON JSC HOSPITALITY INVESTMENT INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/21/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS OVER $10K/UNDER $25K CRC 3.740 FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

NOTICE OF COLLECTION CASE ASSI

NOTICE OF COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 06/05/2018 OF SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (PALM SPRINGS); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/16/18 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 06/05/2018 OF SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC AS TO JSC HOSPITALITY INVESTMENT INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 06/05/2018 OF SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC AS TO HWY 111 HOTEL GROUPLP; MAILING DATE OF 07/11/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 06/05/2018 OF SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC SERVED ON JSC HOSPITALITY INVESTMENT INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/21/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • HEARING IS SET ON 6/06/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 06/05/2018 OF SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS OVER $10K/UNDER $25K CRC 3.740 FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HWY 111 HOTEL GROUP LP is a litigant

Latest cases where SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant