This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 13:34:37 (UTC).

SOMERSET VS AVINA

Case Summary

On 04/28/2016 SOMERSET filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AVINA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0741

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOMERSET LP

Defendant

IAN AVINA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR

3691 Adams Street

Riverside, CA 92504

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE O'CONNOR

3691 Adams Street

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SOMERSET LP.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/24/16

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/28/2016 OF SOMERSET LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 05/06/16.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/28/2016 OF SOMERSET LP AS TO IAN AVINA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMEN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/28/2016 OF SOMERSET LP ON IAN AVINA POSTED AND MAILED ON 05/06/16

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POST

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

DECLARATION OF BARRY LEE OCONN

DECLARATION OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR FILED

DECLARATION OF DENECIA JANUARY

DECLARATION OF DENECIA JANUARY FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/28/2016 OF SOMERSET LP AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SOMERSET LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/24/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/28/2016 OF SOMERSET LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 05/06/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/28/2016 OF SOMERSET LP AS TO IAN AVINA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/28/2016 OF SOMERSET LP ON IAN AVINA POSTED AND MAILED ON 05/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY SOMERSET LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DENECIA JANUARY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/27/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/28/2016 OF SOMERSET LP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOMERSET LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR