Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/18/2016 at 11:03:31 (UTC).

SOHI VS BAZAAR

Case Summary

On 02/07/2002 SOHI filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against BAZAAR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0720

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSCAR SOHI

Defendants

BOMBAY STORES

BOMBAY BAZAAR

HAN KOOK VIDEO

SHAHIDA REHANA

Racnho Cucamonga, CA 91730

NEW INDIA SWEETS AND SPICES

VILLA'S MARKET

LE HOANG VIDEO

HYUNDAI VIDEO

ASIAN GROCERY AND SPICES

9255 Baseline Road #C

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

KWALITY FOODS GIFTS AND ACCESSORIES

T & T VIDEO

NEW BOMBAY STORES

1385 W. Blaine Street

Riverside, CA 92507

MELA ETHNIC GROCERY

INDIA SNACKS AND SPICES

LAN VIDEO

WHA SING ENTERTAINMENT

DIAMOND BAR KOREANVIDEO

TJ HANIN VIDEO

THAI VIDEO AND GIFTS

27258 East Baseline

Highland, CA 92346

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAR & GAMULIN, LLP

One World Trade Center Suite 800

Long Beach, CA 90831

Defendant Attorneys

LOUKIDES & ASSOCIATES

9681 Garden Grove Blvd #204

Garden Grove, CA 92644

BRAHMBHATT, SUNIL A.

2700 N. Main St., Ste. 310

Santa Ana, CA 92705

GOLDBERG, BRUCE E

5738 Carlton Way 309

Los Angeles, CA 90028

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED, SUMMONS ISSUE

COMPLAINT FILED, SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF MOTION PRELIM INJUN

NOTICE OF MOTION PRELIM INJUN DEC/ORDER GRANTING PRELIM INJUN BY OSCAR SOHI FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI BY SHAHIDA REHANA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEF

NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEF TJ HANIN/O SJUNG/DIAMOND BAR VIDEO/H AN KOOK VIDEO/HYUNDAI VIDEO FILED BY OSCAR SOHI

OPPOSITION TO APPLIC FOR PREL

OPPOSITION TO APPLIC FOR PREL INJ/MPA/DECL OF SUNIL A BRAHMBHATT BY NEW INDIA SWEETS AND SPICES FILED

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI BY NEW INDIA SWEETS AND SPICES REPRESENTED BY SUNIL A. BRAHMBHATT FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI BY NEW BOMBAY STORES REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI BY WHA SING ENTERTAINMENT REPRESENTED BY BRUCE E GOLDBERG FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF MOTION SANCT 227 MEM

NOTICE OF MOTION SANCT 227 MEMO POINTS AND AUTHO DECL OF HARPREET BY OSCAR SOHI FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI NAMING DOES 02 TO BE KWALITY FOODS GIFTSAND ACCESSORIES FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR SANCTION

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR SANCTIONS BY NEW INDIA SWEETS AND SPICES FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY OSCA

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY OSCAR SOHI FILED

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMEN

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS A

AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI AS TO NEW INDIA SWEETS AND SPICES FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2010
  • PAPER RECORDS DESTROYED/DIGITALLY ARCHIVED. PAPER DOCUMENTS/FILE DESTROYED IN ACCORDANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE POLICY/RECORDS MANAGEMENT A.10.400.1, PAPER RECORDS RETENTION AND DESTRUCTION SCHEDULE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • COPIES MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2002
  • COPIES MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2002
  • COPIES MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS AN ANSWER OR DEFAULT IS FILED PRIOR TO 09/26/02; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL AS TO NEW INDIA SWEETS AND SPICES; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • DISMISSAL FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2002
  • APPLICATION 3/11/02 FOR WAIVER OF FEES PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS FILED BY ASIAN GROCERY AND SPICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2002
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2002 OF OSCAR SOHI BY ASIAN GROCERY AND SPICES REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2002
  • PROPOSED ORDER REC'D & FORWD TO DEPT. DEPT 10 RIV CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2002
  • HEARING SET 3/28/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION PRELIM INJUN DEC/ORDER GRANTING PRELIM INJUN BY OSCAR SOHI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2002
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/15/02 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2002
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED, SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less