This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 14:02:34 (UTC).

SLUMSKIE V SCUDERO

Case Summary

On 04/03/2014 SLUMSKIE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SCUDERO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0744

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANA SLUMSKIE

Defendants

ROBERT SCUDERO

Temecula, CA 92595

ROXANNE SCUDERO

Temecula, CA 92595

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

308 N Riverside Ave #2E

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2014 OF DIANA SLUMSKIE BY ROBERT SCUDERO, ROXANNE SCUDERO REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ROXANNE SCUDERO IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ROBERT SCUDERO IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON DIANA SLUMSKIE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/04/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2014 OF DIANA SLUMSKIE SERVED ON ROXANNE SCUDERO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/03/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2014 OF DIANA SLUMSKIE SERVED ON ROBERT SCUDERO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/03/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY DIANA SLUMSKIE - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - TEMECULA.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - TEMECULA.; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 4/25/14, AT 8:00, IN DEPT T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY DIANA SLUMSKIE - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2014 OF DIANA SLUMSKIE SERVED ON ROBERT SCUDERO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/03/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2014 OF DIANA SLUMSKIE SERVED ON ROXANNE SCUDERO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/03/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON DIANA SLUMSKIE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/04/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • FEE WAIVER FOR ROBERT SCUDERO WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER FEE; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ROBERT SCUDERO (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ROXANNE SCUDERO (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ROXANNE SCUDERO IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2014 OF DIANA SLUMSKIE BY ROBERT SCUDERO, ROXANNE SCUDERO REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 6/06/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less