This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/08/2016 at 01:30:12 (UTC).

SKB HARBOR GRAND VS PHILLIPS

Case Summary

On 03/28/2011 SKB HARBOR GRAND filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PHILLIPS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3002

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC

Defendants

ERICKA SHENNY PHILLIPS

PAMELA ANN CHAMBERS

Other

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN

7676 Hazard Center Dr. #900C

San Diego, CA 92108

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN

7676 Hazard Center Dr #900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT - SOUTHWEST

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER C

SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC FILED

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC BY PAMELA ANN CHAMBERS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/01/11 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY PAMELA ANN CHAMBERS IS GRANTED; CLERK T HALL (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC BY ERICKA SHENNY PHILLIPS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER UD ON KIMBALL TIREY AND ST JOHN, LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/01/11 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ERICKA SHENNY PHILLIPS IS GRANTED; CLERK T DOWNEY (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ERICKA SHENNY PHILLIPS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/28/11 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO PAMELA ANN CHAMBERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/28/11 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/28/11 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED.

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONOR

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER RONALD L GREY .

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ON

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC CHANGING KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP OFFICE FOR SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC TO KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN DIFFERENT BRANCH OFFICE FILED.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1,295.51 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $165.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY NOT SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO ORANGE COUNTY UNSATIFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $768.11 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $110.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PAMELA ANN CHAMBERS (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/01/11 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC BY PAMELA ANN CHAMBERS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/28/2011 OF SKB HARBOR GRAND LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT - SOUTHWEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S103 (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 5/31/11 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. S103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less