This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/25/2018 at 13:43:08 (UTC).

SINGH VS ACTIVE LINE TRUCKING

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 SINGH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ACTIVE LINE TRUCKING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2932

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRANSPORT ANYTIME,INC

11671 Sterling Ave Suite C

Riverside, CA 92503

JAGDEEP SINGH

Riverside, CA 92503

Defendants

ACTIVE LINE TRUCKING

7718 Del Glen Lane

Houston, TX 77072

ADEWALE OLUGBENIGA FAJEWONYOM

Housten, TX 77072

ADEMOLA ONABANJO

Housten, TX 77072

SOPHIE KING

Housten, TX 77072

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE CONTINUANCE.

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH RESET FILED.

AUTHORIZATION FOR TERESA RAMIR

AUTHORIZATION FOR TERESA RAMIREZ TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY TRANSPORT ANYTIME,INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH AS TO SOPHIE KING, MAILING DATE OF 02/12/18 FILED. COSTS OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH SERVED ON ADEMOLA ONABANJO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/09/18 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $120.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH AS TO ADEWALE OLUGBENIGA FAJEWONYOM, MAILING DATE OF 02/12/18 FILED. COSTS OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH AS TO ACTIVE LINE TRUCKING, MAILING DATE OF 01/03/18 FILED. COSTS OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH SERVED ON ADEMOLA ONABANJO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/23/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $135.00.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE CONTINUANCE.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CALENDAR CHANGE.

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH RESET FILED.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (MORENO VALLEY)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE AS TO

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE AS TO ADEMOLA ONABANJO BY JAGDEEP SINGH FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE OF PL

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM-ACTIVE BY JAGDEEP SINGH FILED

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAI

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY JAGDEEP SINGH FILED

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH RESET FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER/PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (MORENO VALLEY); Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE CONTINUANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (MORENO VALLEY); Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH SERVED ON ACTIVE LINE TRUCKING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/12/18 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH AS TO ADEWALE OLUGBENIGA FAJEWONYOM, MAILING DATE OF 02/12/18 FILED. COSTS OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH SERVED ON ADEMOLA ONABANJO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/09/18 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $120.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 08/18/2017 OF JAGDEEP SINGH AS TO SOPHIE KING, MAILING DATE OF 02/12/18 FILED. COSTS OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR TERESA RAMIREZ TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY TRANSPORT ANYTIME,INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 3/05/18 AT 13:00 IN DEPARTMENT.MV2 - MORENO VALLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY JAGDEEP SINGH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM-KING BY JAGDEEP SINGH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM-ACTIVE BY JAGDEEP SINGH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE AS TO ADEMOLA ONABANJO BY JAGDEEP SINGH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE AS TO ADEWALE FAJEWOMYOM BY JAGDEEP SINGH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 10/13/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT.MV1 - MORENO VALLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (MORENO VALLEY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT MV1. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less