This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 06:52:03 (UTC).

SILVA vs C & M MOTORS

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 SILVA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against C M MOTORS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8042

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDDY MELKONIAN

FRANCISCO SILVA

ROBERT DUMAS

JARED PRUETTE

WALID JABER

MARWAN FRANCIS

Defendants

CLIFFORD CUMMINGS

STEPHEN HILL

C & M MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KAREN J. SLOAT

74-900 Hwy 111 Suite 211

Indian Wells, CA 92210

LAW OFFICES OF KAREN J SLOAT APC

42-600 Caroline Court Suite 101

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Defendant Attorneys

FISHER & PHILLIPS

2050 Main Street Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO /OF PLNTFS MARWA

OPPOSITION TO /OF PLNTFS MARWAN FRANCIS TO DEFS NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO CONSOLIDATE BY MARWAN FRANCIS FILED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8/26/19.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR ALL PURPOSES BY C&M MOTORS.

DECLARATION OF ASHTON M RILEY

DECLARATION OF ASHTON M RILEY ISO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR ALL PURPOSES FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY F

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY FRANCISCO SILVA, MARWAN FRANCIS, EDDY MELKONIAN, WALID JABER, JARED PRUETTE, ROBERT DUMAS FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE ON FOR PLAINTIFFS AS TO FRANCISCO SILVA, EDDY MELKONIAN, WALID JABER, JARED PRUETTE, ROBERT DUMAS FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRANCISCO SILVA, MARWAN FRANCIS, EDDY MELKONIAN, WALID JABER, JARED PRUETTE, ROBERT DUMAS, C & M MOTORS LLC, CLIFFORD CUMMINGS

AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEM

AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRANCISCO SILVA, MARWAN FRANCIS, EDDY MELKONIAN, WALID JABER, JARED PRUETTE, ROBERT DUMAS, C & M MOTORS LLC, CLIFFORD CUMMINGS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY STEPHEN HILL.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FRANCISCO SILVA AS TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN HILL FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FRANCISCO SILVA BY C & M MOTORS LLC, CLIFFORD CUMMINGS REPRESENTED BY FISHER & PHILLIPS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FRANCISCO SILVA BY STEPHEN HILL REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGARD & SMITH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF R

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2018 OF FRANCISCO SILVA AS TO CLIFFORD CUMMINGS WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 02/04/19

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2018 OF FRANCISCO SILVA AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2018 OF FRANCISCO SILVA AND FILED.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE PSC1808042; RIC1811658 DESIGNATED AS THE MASTER FILE; HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY MARWAN FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF BERNARD P.LAHDE IN IPPO TO DEFS C&M MOTORS DBA TOYOTA & C.CUMMING NTC OF MTN CONSOLIDATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO /OF PLNTFS MARWAN FRANCIS TO DEFS NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO CONSOLIDATE BY MARWAN FRANCIS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR ALL PURPOSES BY C & M MOTORS LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR ALL PURPOSES BY C&M MOTORS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ASHTON M RILEY ISO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR ALL PURPOSES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: RE 8/28/19 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2018 OF FRANCISCO SILVA AS TO C & M MOTORS LLC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 02/04/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2018 OF FRANCISCO SILVA SERVED ON STEPHEN HILL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/18/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2018 OF FRANCISCO SILVA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2018 OF FRANCISCO SILVA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2018 OF FRANCISCO SILVA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/26/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92203.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less