Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 22:55:13 (UTC).

SEQUOIA VS CORONADO

Case Summary

On 06/27/2016 SEQUOIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CORONADO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2256

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD

Defendants

SOLMARY SOLER

ANDY CORONADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92505.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2016 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2016 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD AS TO ANDY CORONADO; MAILING DATE OF 06/29/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2016 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD AS TO SOLMARY SOLER; MAILING DATE OF 06/29/16 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2016 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD AS TO ANDY CORONADO, SOLMARY SOLER

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/18/16

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; WHOLLY UNSATISFIED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; WHOLLY UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/18/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2016 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD AS TO ANDY CORONADO, SOLMARY SOLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2016 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD AS TO SOLMARY SOLER; MAILING DATE OF 06/29/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2016 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD AS TO ANDY CORONADO; MAILING DATE OF 06/29/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/26/16 AT 8:00 IN FWMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2016 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES INNBROOK VILLAGE LTD AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92505.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less