This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 16:44:32 (UTC).

SENEMAN LLC vs CITY OF CORONA

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 SENEMAN LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY OF CORONA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Carol A. Greene and IRMA POOLE ASBERRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4918

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Carol A. Greene

IRMA POOLE ASBERRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SENEMAN LLC

GTOK LLC

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF CORONA

CORONA INDUSTRIAL JV LLC

CONOR COMMERICIAL REAL ESTATE LLC

MCSHANE DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS CORP

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION HOLDINGS CORP

LASALLE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC

CONOR COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE LLC

JAMES A. MCSHANE

MCSHANE 2015 TRUST

CORONA COMMONWEALTH, LLC

LIM INVESTMENTS, LP

LIM ASSOCIATES, LLC

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION HOLDINGS CORP., LLC

ROES 1-100

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON TIDUS A LAW CORPORATION

Attorney at JACKSON TIDUS A LAW CORPORATION

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CITY OF CORONA CITY ATTORNEY

GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA

Attorney at GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continued Hearing on City of Corona's Special Motion to Strike (Anti-Slapp)

10/21/2021: Notice of Continued Hearing on City of Corona's Special Motion to Strike (Anti-Slapp)

Minute Order: Hearing on Anti-SLAPP Motion (Special Motion to Strike)

10/21/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Anti-SLAPP Motion (Special Motion to Strike)

Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike (Anti-Slapp)

10/14/2021: Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike (Anti-Slapp)

Evidentiary Objection in Support of Special Motion to Strike (Anit-Slapp)

10/14/2021: Evidentiary Objection in Support of Special Motion to Strike (Anit-Slapp)

Exhibits in support of Opposition to Motion to Strike Volume I on 1st Amended Complaint SENEMAN LLC

10/08/2021: Exhibits in support of Opposition to Motion to Strike Volume I on 1st Amended Complaint SENEMAN LLC

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

10/13/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/12/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

10/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Exhibits in support of Opposition to Special Motion to Strike Volume II on 1st Amended Complaint SENEMAN LLC

10/08/2021: Exhibits in support of Opposition to Special Motion to Strike Volume II on 1st Amended Complaint SENEMAN LLC

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

11/04/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Legacy Minute Order: SENEMAN LLC, GTOK LLC/JACKSON TIDUS A LAW CORPORATION is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service.

11/03/2020: Legacy Minute Order: SENEMAN LLC, GTOK LLC/JACKSON TIDUS A LAW CORPORATION is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service.

Legacy Minute Order: CONOR COMMERICIAL REAL ESTATE LLC/GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service.

11/03/2020: Legacy Minute Order: CONOR COMMERICIAL REAL ESTATE LLC/GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service.

Legacy Minute Order: SENEMAN LLC, GTOK LLC/JACKSON TIDUS A LAW CORPORATION is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service.

11/03/2020: Legacy Minute Order: SENEMAN LLC, GTOK LLC/JACKSON TIDUS A LAW CORPORATION is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service.

Legacy Minute Order: CONOR COMMERICIAL REAL ESTATE LLC/GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service.

11/03/2020: Legacy Minute Order: CONOR COMMERICIAL REAL ESTATE LLC/GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service.

Case Management Statement

03/09/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

05/11/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

05/11/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Return.

05/13/2021: Notice of Document Return.

296 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Quash Service of Summons on; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Quash Service of Summons on; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Quash Service of Summons on; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Anti-SLAPP Motion (Special Motion to Strike); Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Anti-SLAPP Motion (Special Motion to Strike); Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Continued - Demurrer/Motion to Strike hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Anti-SLAPP Motion (Special Motion to Strike)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Continued Hearing on City of Corona's Special Motion to Strike (Anti-Slapp); Filed By: CITY OF CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
285 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of SENEMAN LLC served on CITY OF CORONA with service date of 09/27/19 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of SENEMAN LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of SENEMAN LLC as to CORONA INDUSTRIAL JV LLC; mailing date of 09/27/19 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of SENEMAN LLC and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92879.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/23/2019; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2309 Receipt No.: CV190927-0532-FE.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/23/2019; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2309 Receipt No.: CV190927-0395-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LASALLE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant