This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 14:13:50 (UTC).

SELDEN VS VERICAN

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 SELDEN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VERICAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0745

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMILY SELDEN

Defendants

VERICAN INC

ERIC BUSKIRK

Hemet, CA 92543

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS WOJCIK DUARTE APLC

1001 E Morton Pl, Ste A

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS RASMUSSEN

40639 Rosalie Avenue

Hemet, CA 92544

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN AS TO VERICAN INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/11/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN AS TO ERIC BUSKIRK; MAILING DATE OF 07/10/17 FILED.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN BY ERIC BUSKIRK REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000)

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN BY VERICAN INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS RASMUSSEN FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ERIC BUSKIRK IS DEN; HONORABLE JUDGE ANGEL M. BERMUDEZ (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

NOTICE RE: VOIDED DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE RE: VOIDED DOCUMENT(S) AS TO ERIC BUSKIRK FILED.

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFE

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT VERICAN INC BY EMILY SELDEN FILED

DECLARATION OF ERIC BUSKIRK ME

DECLARATION OF ERIC BUSKIRK MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CCP430.41(A)(3) FILED

DECLARATION OF VERICAN INC RE:

DECLARATION OF VERICAN INC RE: MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CCP430.41(A)(3) FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MA

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MATTHEW DUARTE RE OPPOSITION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER ON 10/18/2017 FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN BY VERICAN INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS RASMUSSEN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EMILY SELDEN

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EMILY SELDEN

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY EMILY SELDEN.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT AND CMC HEARING.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN AND FILED.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY EMILY SELDEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY EMILY SELDEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EMILY SELDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VERICAN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ERIC BUSKIRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY EMILY SELDEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EMILY SELDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN BY ERIC BUSKIRK REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN BY VERICAN INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS RASMUSSEN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • FAX FILING BY EMILY SELDEN ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • FAX FILING BY EMILY SELDEN ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN AS TO VERICAN INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/11/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/28/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF EMILY SELDEN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT AND CMC HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • FAX FILING BY EMILY SELDEN ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S302. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less