This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 09:23:41 (UTC).

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. vs CONTE

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CONTE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2066

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC

Defendants

FLEETWOOD ALUMINUMPRODUCTS, INC.

ANDREW MICHAEL CONTE

FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL MORENO & STETTLER APC

Attorney at SIEGEL MORENO & STETTLER APC

1615 Murray Canyon Rd Ste 1020

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

02/08/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

01/29/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Certificate of Mailing

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

12/11/2020: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Declaration of Kelsey Mezzanatto Daniel re Order to Show Cause re Dismissal

12/09/2020: Declaration of Kelsey Mezzanatto Daniel re Order to Show Cause re Dismissal

System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

10/09/2020: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

Declaration of KELSEY MEZZANATTO DANIEL re Order to Show Cause re Dismissal filed

10/06/2020: Declaration of KELSEY MEZZANATTO DANIEL re Order to Show Cause re Dismissal filed

Notice of Related Case(s) RIC2001116 filed.

07/17/2020: Notice of Related Case(s) RIC2001116 filed.

Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code Sections 3853 by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. filed.

07/17/2020: Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code Sections 3853 by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. filed.

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. filed.

07/09/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92882.

06/25/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92882.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

06/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. and filed.

06/25/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. and filed.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

06/25/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b).; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b).; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Kelsey Mezzanatto Daniel re Order to Show Cause re Dismissal; Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b).; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued - Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Related Case(s) RIC2001116 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code Sections 3853 by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. filed.; Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information by SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. filed.; Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/29/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #3662 Receipt No.: CV200629-0218-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for all Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92882.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 02/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fleetwood Aluminum Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant