This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 08:49:23 (UTC).

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES vs PEP BOYS

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PEP BOYS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0476

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

Defendants

PEP BOYS AUTO PARTS & SERVICE

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

TREMAINE RIDER

PEP BOYS

RON DOE

VINCE DOE

CORY DOE

THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK

THE PEP BOYS AUTO CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adelson Mclean, APC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

09/02/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Adelson Mclean, APC, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO., THE HERTZ CORPORATION

09/02/2021: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Adelson Mclean, APC, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO., THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Certificate of Mailing

09/01/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/01/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

08/24/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Declaration of Counsel in Opposition to OSC re Sanctions for Failure to Serve Defendants

08/24/2021: Declaration of Counsel in Opposition to OSC re Sanctions for Failure to Serve Defendants

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

06/22/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

06/21/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

Certificate of Mailing

06/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

06/07/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Summons Issued and Filed

01/08/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Document Return.

12/23/2020: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

12/23/2020: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

12/23/2020: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

12/08/2020: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/08/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/08/2020: Certificate of Counsel.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Adelson Mclean, APC, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO., THE HERTZ CORPORATION; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Adelson Mclean, APC, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO., THE HERTZ CORPORATION; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Adelson Mclean, APC, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO., THE HERTZ CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES; Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES; ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.; THE HERTZ CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/23/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *9684 Receipt No.: 20201223-00049.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES; ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.; THE HERTZ CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES; ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.; THE HERTZ CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES; ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.; THE HERTZ CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEP BOYS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant