Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 15:15:21 (UTC).

SEABOARD INC VS HALL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2014 SEABOARD INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HALL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0792

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEABOARD INC

Defendant

DANIEL HALL

Cabazon, CA 92230

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINDHAM, WILLIAM E

1051 E 1St Street

Beaumont, CA 92223

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

170.6 FILED BY SEABOARD INC AG

170.6 FILED BY SEABOARD INC AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF SEABOARD INC BY DANIEL HALL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UD ON WILLIAM E WINDHAM WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/07/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DANIEL HALL IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF SEABOARD INC SERVED ON DANIEL HALL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/02/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SEABOARD INC - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF SEABOARD INC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 08/02/14.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF SEABOARD INC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGM

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 08/27/14; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SEABOARD INC.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SEABOARD INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 08/27/14; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF SEABOARD INC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF SEABOARD INC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 08/02/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 8/27/14, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF SEABOARD INC BY DANIEL HALL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY SEABOARD INC AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/30/14 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seaboard Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINDHAM, WILLIAM E