This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 09:15:02 (UTC).

SCOTT VS MCMANUS

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 SCOTT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCMANUS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0080

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW S SCOTT

Defendant

CARLOS A MCMANUS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 03/23/16.

LETTER RE CHALLENGE VENUE BY C

LETTER RE CHALLENGE VENUE BY CARLOS MCMANUS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 01/19/2016 OF MATTHEW SCOTT SERVED ON CARLOS A MCMANUS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/02/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (SOUTHWEST).

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFA

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, CARLOS A MCMANUS FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, CARLOS A MCMANUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; SAN DIEGO COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $32.90 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $61.50 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketRETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR CARLOS A MCMANUS AS TO NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; REASON RETURNED: UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketRULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 09/19/16 RE: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketHEARING IS SET ON 3/23/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER RE CHALLENGE VENUE BY CARLOS MCMANUS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketFAX FILING BY MATTHEW S SCOTT ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 01/19/2016 OF MATTHEW SCOTT SERVED ON CARLOS A MCMANUS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/02/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketFAX FILING BY MATTHEW S SCOTT ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketCLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (SOUTHWEST).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 3/23/16, AT 8:00, IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (SOUTHWEST).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT S205. (SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less