This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 19:51:04 (UTC).

SCHMUTZ VS SHEEKS

Case Summary

On 04/30/2014 SCHMUTZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHEEKS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0966

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT SCHMUTZ

Defendants

AMANDA SHEEKS

SIDNEY SHEEKS

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARRY LEE OCONNER

3691 Adams Street

Riverside, CA 92504

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR

3691 Adams Street

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SIDNEY SHEEKS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/30/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO AMANDA SHEEKS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/30/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AS TO AMANDA SHEEKS, SIDNEY SHEEKS FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/30/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/30/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ROBERT SCHMUTZ.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ROBERT SCHMUTZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/30/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT PACKET SUBMITTED BY ROBERT SCHMUTZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/30/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AS TO AMANDA SHEEKS, SIDNEY SHEEKS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO AMANDA SHEEKS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/30/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF ROBERT SCHMUTZ AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SIDNEY SHEEKS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/30/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 7/11/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less