This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/07/2016 at 14:28:05 (UTC).

SCE VS J&R FERNANDEZ INC;HENKELS&MCCOY INC

Case Summary

On 12/09/2010 SCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J R FERNANDEZ INC HENKELS MCCOY INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0908

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON CO A CORP

2244 Walnut Grove Ave P O Box 900

Rosemead, CA 91770

Defendants

J & R FERNANDEZ INC

11244 Pipeline Ave

Pomona, CA 91766

HENKELS & MCCOY INC

2840 Ficus St

Pomona, CA 91766

VERIZON CALIFORNIAINC

2620 Thousan Oaks Blvd Ste2220

Memphis, TN 38118

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE THAN 12 PER YEAR)

1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP FILED (AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 12/09/2010 OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP AS TO J & R FERNANDEZ INC, MAILING DATE OF 12/23/10 FILED. COSTS OF $88.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP SERVED ON HENKELS & MCCOY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/10 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $125.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP SERVED ON VERIZON CALIFORNIAINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/10 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $53.00.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2012
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - HEMET; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DATE TO SET OSC FOR DESTRUCTION (DISMISSAL) IS SET 1/24/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. HEDST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP SERVED ON VERIZON CALIFORNIAINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/10 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $53.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP SERVED ON HENKELS & MCCOY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/10 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 12/09/2010 OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP AS TO J & R FERNANDEZ INC, MAILING DATE OF 12/23/10 FILED. COSTS OF $88.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP FILED (AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: AMENDED PLAINTIFFS CLAIM SUBMITTED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON CO ACORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET FOR 1/28/11, AT 13:30, IN DEPT. H1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2010
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE THAN 12 PER YEAR)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J&R FERNANDEZ INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HENKELS & MCCOY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant