This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:19:32 (UTC).

SAVITZ VS WEBB

Case Summary

On 06/19/2015 SAVITZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WEBB. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2833

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE

Claimant

O'HARA & DURIS PLC

735 State Street #632

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Defendants

JOHN WEBB

CITY OF DESERT HOTSPRINGS

TOP SHOP

FIRST WESTERN PROPERTIES

WILD ASS RANCH

THE ESTATE OF JOHNWEBB DECEASED

FIVE PALMS REAL ESTATE

BREANNA SEWELL

DESERT EMPIRE REALTY

ARAGON BUSINESS CENTER

IVAN SEWELL

DAVID WEBB AS TRUSTEE OF THE WEBB FAMILY

DAVID WEBB INDIVIDUALLY AND ASSUCCESSOR IN

DHS REALTY

MANUEL ARAGON

MANNY ARAGON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Claimant Attorneys

OHARA & DURIS PLC

735 State Street #632

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

HARRIS PERSONAL INJURY LAWYERSINC

629 State Street #201

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

O'HARA & DURIS PLC

735 State Street #632

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Defendant Attorneys

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS

3333 14Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

GRAVES & KING

3610 Fourteenth Street Second Floor

Riverside, CA 92502

MCCLAUGHERTY & ASSOCIATES

222 E. Huntington Drive Suite 230

Monrovia, CA 91016

ERIC R HEDSTROM

28220 Avenida La Vista Ste A

Cathedral City, CA 92234

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH

21031 Ventura Blvd #800

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

101 W Broadway Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF /REPLY TO/

PROOF OF SERVICE OF /REPLY TO/OPPOSITION TO/MTN TO COMPEL/J/WEBB SERVED ON DEFENDANT JOHN WEBB SERVED 09/13/16 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTF OPPO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTF OPPO TO DEF DEMURRER SERVED ON PAUL V ASH ATTY FOR DEF MANNY ARAGON SERVED 02/07/17 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE AS TO FIRST WESTERN PROPERTIES; MAILING DATE OF 04/05/17 FILED.

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE BY JOHN WEBB REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE AS TO FIVE PALMS REAL ESTATE FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY MANUE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY MANUEL ARAGON FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 2ND A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE AS TO DEFENDANT DHS REALTY FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE BY MANUEL ARAGON FILED

FILED: PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY

FILED: PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY OF PLTF MPA IN OPPO/ DECL/SEP STMT ON PAUL V ASH

COURT'S RULING ON TENTATIVE MO

COURT'S RULING ON TENTATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN ALT. SUMMARY ADJ BY DEFENDANTS ARAGON DATED 02/05/18.

AMENDMENT TO 2ND AMENDED COMPL

AMENDMENT TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE NAMING DOES 11 TO BE DAVID WEBB AS TRUSTEE OF THE WEBB FAMILY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 2ND AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE SERVED ON DAVID WEBB INDIVIDUALLY AND ASSUCCESSOR IN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/09/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FO

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT PURPOSES

ORDER FOR REQUEST TO CONTINUE

ORDER FOR REQUEST TO CONTINUE MOTION RESERVATION IS DEN AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE A

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO REINSTATE DEFT SERVED ON JAMES GOLDMAN ESQ. SERVED 10/16/18 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND ADDITIONAL DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPO TO DEFTS FILED BY SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE.

AMENDED NOTICE OF LIEN OF OHAR

AMENDED NOTICE OF LIEN OF OHARA & DURIS PLC FILED BY O'HARA & DURIS PLC

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO INLAND EMPIRE HEALTH PLAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO JOHN F KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL - INDIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER OF DIMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE SUBMITTED BY SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT SUBMITTED BY SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
446 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2015
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2015 OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE AS TO JOHN WEBB FILED BY 070915

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2015 OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE AS TO JOHN WEBB; MAILING DATE OF 07/16/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2015 OF SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE SERVED ON CITY OF DESERT HOTSPRINGS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/02/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92240.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • FAX FILING BY SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • FAX FILING BY SALLY SAVITZPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE/TRUSTEE ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less