This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/10/2016 at 11:45:57 (UTC).

SAVALAS VS STEARNS

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 SAVALAS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against STEARNS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3595

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEAN KATHERINE SAVALAS

STEPHANIE SAVALAS JAMES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MICHAEL B STEARNS

KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY A CORPORATION

MICHAEL HILGENBERG

KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

MICHAEL B STEARNS TRUSTEE OF THE MICHAEL

HILGENBERG REALTY INC

HEATH MICHAEL HILGENBERG INC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MICHAEL HILGENBERG

KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

HILGENBERG REALTY INC

HMH REDLANDS INC

DAVID PAUL FULLER

LEONIE M FULLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CORNELIUS, BYRON G

68457 E Palm Canyon Dr Ste 7

Cathedral City, CA 92234

LAW OFFICES OF BYRON G CORNELIUS

68457 E Palm Canyon Dr #7

Cathedral City, CA 92234

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FROMBERG EDELSTEIN& FROMBERG

2825 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite D-1

Palm Springs, CA 92262

CARLSON LAW GROUP

21031 Ventura Blvd Suite 1100

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

74830 Highway 111 #200

Indian Wells, CA 92210

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CARLSON LAW GROUP

21031 Ventura Blvd Suite 1100

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

74830 Highway 111 #200

Indian Wells, CA 92210

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260/92270.

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATI

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEROF BY JEAN KATHERINE SAVALAS, STEPHANIE SAVALAS JAMES FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS SERVED ON MICHAEL B STEARNS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS AS TO MICHAEL HILGENBERG; MAILING DATE OF 08/17/15 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS SERVED ON KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING BY

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING BY JEAN KATHERINE SAVALAS, STEPHANIE SAVALAS JAMES FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS AS TO MICHAEL B STEARNS, KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS AS TO MICHAEL HILGENBERG; MAILING DATE OF 08/12/15 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS AS TO MICHAEL HILGENBERG FILED.

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS AS TO MICHAEL HILGENBERG, HILGENBERG REALTY INC REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITHLLP FILED

MOTION TO/FOR RELIEF FROM DEFA

MOTION TO/FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT BY MICHAEL B STEARNS FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION RE MI

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION RE MICHAEL B STEARNS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT BY MICHAEL B STEARNS FILED.

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELI

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T LATTING.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS BY HILGENBERG REALTY INC REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITHLLP FILED.

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATION/ MPAS/DECLARATION OF BYRON G CORNELIUS BY JEAN KATHERINE SAVALAS, STEPHANIE SAVALAS JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY MICHAEL B STEARNS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY HILGENBERG REALTY INC, MICHAEL HILGENBERG FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY JEAN KATHERIN SAVALAS;STEPHANIE SAVALAS JAMES FOR HEARING 08/18/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATION/ MPAS/DECLARATION OF BYRON G CORNELIUS BY JEAN KATHERINE SAVALAS, STEPHANIE SAVALAS JAMES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE: ON MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF 1ST AMEN COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO STRIKE - RES57232; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY HILGENBERG REALTY INC, MICHAEL HILGENBERG; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2015
  • Docket--AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS SERVED ON KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS AS TO MICHAEL HILGENBERG; MAILING DATE OF 08/17/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/04/2015 OF JEAN SAVALAS SERVED ON MICHAEL B STEARNS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY BYRON G CORNELIUS FOR HEARING 08/25/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ARBITRATION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEROF BY JEAN KATHERINE SAVALAS, STEPHANIE SAVALAS JAMES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketUPDATE PARTY KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260/92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILGENBERG REALTY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MICHAEL J COLEMAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE MICHAEL is a litigant

Latest cases where Keller Williams Realty, Inc. is a litigant