This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/24/2016 at 03:07:20 (UTC).

SAUL MARTINEZ VS MARIA EVA RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 06/13/2012 SAUL MARTINEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARIA EVA RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4229

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SAUL MARTINEZ

VERONICA L KOONS

MARIA EVA RAMIREZ

MARTINEZ CONSTRUCTION

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS

DREAMSCAPE INVESTMENTS INC

MARTINEZ CONSTRUCTION A BUSINESS ENTITY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MARIA EVA RAMRIEZ

VERONICA L KOONS

MARIA EVA RAMIREZ

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KRUPPE, MICHAEL A.

77-564A Country Club Dr Ste. 201

Palm Desert, CA 92211

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL A. KRUPPE

77564A Country Club Dr Ste 102

Palm Desert, CA 92211

WINET, PATRICK & WEAVER

1199 East Ramon Road

Palm Springs, CA 92264

HAUSMAN SOSA & HUDSON

18757 Burbank Blvd Suite 305

Tarzana, CA 91356-6329

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

WINET, PATRICK & WEAVER

1199 East Ramon Road

Palm Springs, CA 92264

WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1199 East Ramon Road

Palm Springs, CA 92264

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HAUSMAN SOSA & HUDSON

18757 Burbank Blvd Suite 305

Tarzana, CA 91356-6329

WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1199 East Ramon Road

Palm Springs, CA 92264

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE OR CITY/COMMUNITY IS 92240.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2012 OF SAUL MARTINEZ FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARIA EVA RAMIREZ

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/03/2012 OF MARIA RAMIREZ BY SAUL MARTINEZ REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL A. KRUPPE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS COMPLA

GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/03/2012 OF MARIA RAMIREZ BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS REPRESENTED BY HAUSMAN SOSA & HUDSON FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SAUL MARTINEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF MEDIATION COMPLETTIO

NOTICE OF MEDIATION COMPLETTION DATE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY MARIA EVA RAMIREZ, VERONICA L KOONS FILED.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPR

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPRINGS AND REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO PS1 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF COURT OR

RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION FILED BY MARIA EVA RAMIREZ, VERONICA L KOONS

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONA

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT ( FIRST FILED BY MICHAEL R. KAISER (FORM ADR-100).

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A KRUPP

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A KRUPPE REGARDING OSC FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: ORDER TO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FILED

JUDGMENT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED

JUDGMENT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2014
  • D#1003362771 7/15/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • CK#3320071559 $10007.86 3/14/14 SENT TO SURETEC INSURANCE CO C/O HAUSMAN & SOSA LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • TRUST EXONERATE-POSTED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • TRUST EXONERATION - INTEREST BEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • TRUST DEPOSIT - POSTED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2012 OF SAUL MARTINEZ FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/03/2012 OF MARIA RAMIREZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2012 OF SAUL MARTINEZ BY MARIA EVA RAMIREZ, VERONICA L KOONS REPRESENTED BY WINET, PATRICK & WEAVER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF NOTICE PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • -- AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/03/2012 OF MARIA RAMIREZ (CROSS-COMPLAINT) SERVED ON SAUL MARTINEZ, MARTINEZ CONSTRUCTION A BUSINESS ENTITY AND MAILED ON 10/02/12 --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MARIA EVA RAMIREZ, VERONICA L KOONS REPRESENTED BY WINET, PATRICK & WEAVER FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2012 OF SAUL MARTINEZ SERVED ON VERONICA L KOONS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/01/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2012 OF SAUL MARTINEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE OR CITY/COMMUNITY IS 92240.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less