Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 06:41:25 (UTC).

SARIAN VS L'OREAL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2016 SARIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against L'OREAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0561

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAILEY SARIAN

Defendants

L'OREAL USA INC

NYX LOS ANGELES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ONE LLP

Attorney at ONE LLP

4000 Macarthur Blvd East Tower, Ste 500

Newport, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Without prejudice Entire Action filed

08/22/2016: Request for Dismissal Without prejudice Entire Action filed

Stipulation and Order for Extending Time for Defendants to Respond is Granted; Honorable Judge Angel M. Bermudez.

08/12/2016: Stipulation and Order for Extending Time for Defendants to Respond is Granted; Honorable Judge Angel M. Bermudez.

Proof of Service on the Complaint of SARIAN served on NYX LOS ANGELES INC with service date of 07/11/16 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of BAILEY SARIAN

07/26/2016: Proof of Service on the Complaint of SARIAN served on NYX LOS ANGELES INC with service date of 07/11/16 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of BAILEY SARIAN

Proof of Service on the Complaint of SARIAN served on L'OREAL USA INC with service date of 07/11/16 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of BAILEY SARIAN

07/26/2016: Proof of Service on the Complaint of SARIAN served on L'OREAL USA INC with service date of 07/11/16 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of BAILEY SARIAN

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

06/27/2016: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

Summons Issued on Complaint of SARIAN and filed.

06/27/2016: Summons Issued on Complaint of SARIAN and filed.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest)

06/27/2016: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2017
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal Without prejudice Entire Action filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation and Order for Extending Time for Defendants to Respond is Granted; Honorable Judge Angel M. Bermudez.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $900.00; Paid: $900.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/11/2016; Fine Description: Check #3481268 Receipt No.: CV160811-0100-CK.1; Paid: $900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of SARIAN served on NYX LOS ANGELES INC with service date of 07/11/16 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of BAILEY SARIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of SARIAN served on L'OREAL USA INC with service date of 07/11/16 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of BAILEY SARIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/27/2016; Fine Description: Check #73190 Receipt No.: CV160627-0207-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of SARIAN and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of BAILEY SARIAN; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 08/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc. is a litigant