This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:22:30 (UTC).

SANCHEZ VS CARPENTER CO

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 SANCHEZ filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against CARPENTER CO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4219

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLANCA SANCHEZ

Defendants

CARPENTER CO

E.R. CARPENTER COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUSTICE LAW CORPORATION

Attorney at JUSTICE LAW CORPORATION

751 N. Fair Oaks Ave Ste. 101

Pasadena, CA 91103-3069

Defendant Attorney

Sabrina Alexis Beldner

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ by CARPENTER CO

10/27/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ by CARPENTER CO

Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ by CARPENTER CO

10/27/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ by CARPENTER CO

Order Granting Verified Application of Amy M. Turk to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

10/20/2021: Order Granting Verified Application of Amy M. Turk to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Defendant's Reply in Support of Demurrers to Plaintiffs Complaint and Request for Judicial Notice in Support Thereof on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

10/20/2021: Defendant's Reply in Support of Demurrers to Plaintiffs Complaint and Request for Judicial Notice in Support Thereof on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

10/20/2021: Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

Joint Case Management Statement

10/20/2021: Joint Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling on Unopposed Application of Amy M. Turk to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

10/13/2021: Notice of Ruling on Unopposed Application of Amy M. Turk to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

Plaintiff Blanca Sanchez's Opposition to Defendant Carpenter Co. d/b/a E.R. Carpenter Company, Inc.'s Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

10/14/2021: Plaintiff Blanca Sanchez's Opposition to Defendant Carpenter Co. d/b/a E.R. Carpenter Company, Inc.'s Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Plaintiff Blanca Sanchez's Opposition to Defendant Carpenter Co. dba E.R. Carpenter, Inc.'s Motion to Strike

10/14/2021: Plaintiff Blanca Sanchez's Opposition to Defendant Carpenter Co. dba E.R. Carpenter, Inc.'s Motion to Strike

Minute Order: Verified Application of Amy M Turk to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

10/13/2021: Minute Order: Verified Application of Amy M Turk to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Motion/Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

09/16/2021: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Motion/Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

Verified Application of Amy M Turk to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

09/16/2021: Verified Application of Amy M Turk to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Notice of Appearance and Change of Counsel on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

09/16/2021: Notice of Appearance and Change of Counsel on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve Order Extending Time to Serve on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

08/12/2021: Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve Order Extending Time to Serve on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

08/11/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

08/09/2021: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

Defendant's Demurrers to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

08/09/2021: Defendant's Demurrers to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

Notice of Document Return.

07/29/2021: Notice of Document Return.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ by CARPENTER CO; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Held - Demurrer/Motion to Strike hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ by CARPENTER CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *7323 Receipt No.: 20211021-00229.1; Paid: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ; Filed By: CARPENTER CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Reply in Support of Demurrers to Plaintiffs Complaint and Request for Judicial Notice in Support Thereof on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ; Filed By: CARPENTER CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Joint Case Management Statement; Filed By: BLANCA SANCHEZ; CARPENTER CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California; Filed By: CARPENTER CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ; Filed By: BLANCA SANCHEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/26/2020; Fine Description: Check #3795966 Receipt No.: CV201026-0236-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CRC 3.722).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of SANCHEZ and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed - Class Action. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of BLANCA SANCHEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E.R. CARPENTER COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CARPENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELDNER, SABRINA A.