This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 23:35:15 (UTC).

SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP VS GREEN

Case Summary

On 07/07/2016 SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GREEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2388

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP

Defendants

LURISSA R GREEN

LURISSA RENEE GREEN

Riverside, CA 92503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP.

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP - MORENO VALLEY (FORM UD-150).

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY LURISSA RENEE GREEN IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/07/2016 OF SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP BY LURISSA RENEE GREEN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/07/2016 OF SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - MORENO VALLEY; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP - MORENO VALLEY (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 8/03/16, AT 13:00,IN DEPT. MV1UD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • INITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR LURISSA RENEE GREEN TO BE RETURNED BY 07/18/16. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FEE WAIVER FOR LURISSA RENEE GREEN WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST FILING FEE; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2016
  • LURISSA RENEE GREEN ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS LURISSA R GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/07/2016 OF SAN BERNARDO COMPANY LP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/06/16 AT 8:00 IN FWMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less