This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 19:32:58 (UTC).

SALDANA VS SEGUNDO

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 SALDANA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SEGUNDO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1307

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GERALDO E SALDANA

Defendants

ESTEBAN SEGUNDO

ARCELIA ANTUNEZ

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE O'CONNOR

3691 Adams St.

Riverside, CA 92504

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GILBERT M GUTIERREZ

4110 Brockton Ave

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 11/03/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/03/2017 OF GERALDO SALDANA AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/03/2017 OF GERALDO SALDANA BY ESTEBAN SEGUNDO REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF GILBERT M GUTIERREZ FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON BARRY LEE OCONNOR WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/14/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POST

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/03/2017 OF GERALDO SALDANA AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/09/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY GERALDO E SALDANA - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/03/2017 OF GERALDO SALDANA AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ARCELIA ANTUNEZ; AND MAILED ON 08/09/17 FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE NUNC PRO TUNC ON 8/30/17.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY FILED ON 08/28/17 BY GERALDO E SALDANA WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 08/30/17.

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONOR

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK .

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/15/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 11/03/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • HEARING RE: COMPLIANCE WITH STIPULATION; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY GERALDO E SALDANA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/15/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • INTERPRETER REQUESTED FOR NEXT APPEARANCE ON 9/15/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT INTM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK .

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER SUBMITTED BY ESTEBAN SEGUNDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY GERALDO E SALDANA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/02/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/03/2017 OF GERALDO SALDANA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less