This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2018 at 11:33:06 (UTC).

SALAS VS COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 SALAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0048

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAREN SALAS

Defendant

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH Y AVRAHAMY

16530 Ventura Boulevard Suite 208

Encino, CA 91436

MICHAEL O'BEIRNE ESQ

25712 Le Parc Unit 10

Lake Forest, CA 92630

Defendant Attorney

SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP

4204 Riverwalk Parkway Suite 250

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANA

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/SET TSC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KAREN SALAS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2017 OF KAREN SALAS AS TO PLAINTIFF KAREN SALAS ADDING ATTORNEY MICHAEL O'BEIRNE ESQ FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2017 OF KAREN SALAS BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2017 OF KAREN SALAS AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2017 OF KAREN SALAS SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/03/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET 3/15/19 AT 10:00 IN 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/SET TSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KAREN SALAS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2017 OF KAREN SALAS AS TO PLAINTIFF KAREN SALAS ADDING ATTORNEY MICHAEL O'BEIRNE ESQ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FILING FEE OF $450.00 FOR COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE IS WAIVED-EXEMPT PER GOVT CODE 6103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2017 OF KAREN SALAS BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2017 OF KAREN SALAS SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/03/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/09/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2017 OF KAREN SALAS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less