This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/18/2018 at 06:37:28 (UTC).

SALAS VS BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 SALAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8149

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORRAINE SALAS

Defendant

BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOULD & ASSOCIATES

17822 East 17Th Street Ste 106

Tustin, CA 92870

Defendant Attorney

DOWNEY DAY

74040 Highway 111 Ste L

Palm Desert, CA 92260

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LORRAINE SALAS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY LORRAINE SALAS.

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANA

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/SET TSC

NOTICE OF HEARING OFF CALENDAR

NOTICE OF HEARING OFF CALENDAR BY LORRAINE SALAS FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2017 OF LORRAINE SALAS BY BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION REPRESENTED BY DOWNEY DAY FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2017 OF LORRAINE SALAS AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503.

170.6 CCP FILED BY LORRAINE SA

170.6 CCP FILED BY LORRAINE SALAS AGAINST JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK IS GRANTED.

CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT

CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2017 OF LORRAINE SALAS AS TO BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION; MAILING DATE OF 09/29/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT BY

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT BY LORRAINE SALAS FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OFF CALENDAR BY LORRAINE SALAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/SET TSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY LORRAINE SALAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY LORRAINE SALAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LORRAINE SALAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2017 OF LORRAINE SALAS BY BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION REPRESENTED BY DOWNEY DAY FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT BY LORRAINE SALAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2017 OF LORRAINE SALAS AS TO BORREGO COMMUNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION; MAILING DATE OF 09/29/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 CCP FILED BY LORRAINE SALAS AGAINST JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/27/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2017 OF LORRAINE SALAS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 01. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less