This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 00:48:34 (UTC).

SAIN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS LEE

Case Summary

On 08/21/2013 SAIN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0898

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAIN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

LAUREL LEE

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINDHAM, WILLIAM

790 Beaumont Ave #124

Beaumont, CA 92223

 

Court Documents

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 09/05/13

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 08/24/13.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

170.6 FILED BY SAIN FAMILY LIM

170.6 FILED BY SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP AS TO LAUREL LEE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP SERVED ON LAUREL LEE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/24/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 09/05/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 08/24/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP AS TO LAUREL LEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP SERVED ON LAUREL LEE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/24/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/21/2013 OF SAIN FAMILY LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 10/23/13 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINDHAM, WILLIAM E