This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/30/2016 at 12:21:01 (UTC).

RYLIE PIPER VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 05/29/2014 RYLIE PIPER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1197

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendants

ERNESTO MARTINEZ

ANGELICA TENA

DEBBIE MARTINEZ

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Rd

Irvine, CA 92620

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/10/14.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ERNESTO MARTINEZ BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/10/14.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DEBBIE MARTINEZ BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/10/14.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ANGELICA TENA BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/10/14.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/26/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC AS TO ERNESTO MARTINEZ, ANGELICA TENA, DEBBIE MARTINEZ, UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

AMENDED RETURN ON WRIT OF POSS

AMENDED RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; NOT SATISFIED FILED

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST OR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT BY RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DECL/JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 11/21/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC. ADDRESS CHANGED FOR: KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; NOT SATISFIED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY RYLIE PIPER ASSOCIATES, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 8/01/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less