This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 18:47:14 (UTC).

RUBIO VS ABU ZUBIDAH

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 RUBIO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ABU ZUBIDAH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1237

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAUL RUBIO

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant

MOHAMMAD K ABU ZUBIDAH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/21/2017 OF RAUL RUBIO AND FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/21/2017 OF RAUL RUBIO AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MOHAMMAD K ABU ZUBIDAH BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 07/28/17.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/21/2017 OF RAUL RUBIO AS TO MOHAMMAD K ABU ZUBIDAH

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RAUL RUBIO.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/15/17

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RAUL RUBIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/21/2017 OF RAUL RUBIO AS TO MOHAMMAD K ABU ZUBIDAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK SUBMITTED BY RAUL RUBIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/21/2017 OF RAUL RUBIO AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MOHAMMAD K ABU ZUBIDAH BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 07/28/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY RAUL RUBIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/21/2017 OF RAUL RUBIO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/19/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less