This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 01:03:41 (UTC).

RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC vs ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALVARADO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0098

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

Defendants

WILFREDO ALVARADO

WILFREDO ALEXANDER PULUN ALVARADO

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael William Mihelich

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000)

12/21/2020: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/21/2020: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130)

12/21/2020: Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130)

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

12/21/2020: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

Notice of Department Assignment

01/11/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

01/11/2021: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Department Assignment on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

01/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Department Assignment on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

02/02/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

02/02/2021: Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

Application for Judgment by Default by Clerk Restitution of Premises Only (RI-CI031) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

02/02/2021: Application for Judgment by Default by Clerk Restitution of Premises Only (RI-CI031) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

02/02/2021: Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

02/22/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

Return on Writ of Possession Satisfied

03/10/2021: Return on Writ of Possession Satisfied

Judgment Unlawful Detainer by Clerk for Possession only

02/02/2021: Judgment Unlawful Detainer by Clerk for Possession only

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

02/02/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Return on Writ of Possession Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Writ of Possession Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/08/2021; Fine Description: Check #30704 Receipt No.: 20210208-00694.1; Paid: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Request for Entry of Default Clerk's Judgment on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Possession; Applies to: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC; For/Against: For - RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC Against - WILFREDO ALVARADO; Details; Writ Fee: $40.00; Possession; Premises Address: 3661 Pacific Avenue RIVERSIDE, CA, 92509; Writ of Possession Issued for County: Riverside on 02/08/2021 - expires on 08/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10 Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 02/02/2031; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer by Clerk for Possession only; Filed By: RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application for Judgment by Default by Clerk Restitution of Premises Only (RI-CI031) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Department Assignment on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper in unlawful detainer amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $270.00; Paid: $270.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/11/2021; Fine Description: Check #30614 Receipt No.: 20210111-00501.1; Paid: $270.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130); Filed By: RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000); Filed By: RUBIDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of RUBUDOUX TRAILER PARK LLC; Disposition: Clerk's Default Judgment 02/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less