This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 12:34:51 (UTC).

ROYCE INTERNATIONAL VS ATLANTIC SPECIALTY

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 ROYCE INTERNATIONAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ATLANTIC SPECIALTY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3997

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO

SILVER STATE BROADCASTING LLC

GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING LLC

EDWARD R STOLZ, II

Claimant

WB MUSIC CORP ET AL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LEILANI JOY BERNARDO

ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY

ONEBEACON

ASIC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ADLI LAW GROUP

Claimant Attorney

ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER

Defendant Attorneys

KAJIOKA & ASSOCIATES

DYKEMA GOSSETT PLLC FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY LLP

P. K. SCHRIEFFER LLP

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY LLP

 

Court Documents

Reply to /in Support of Its Discovery Motions by ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed

02/15/2019: Reply to /in Support of Its Discovery Motions by ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed

Declaration of Jeffrey J Ward in Support of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Companys Discovery Motions filed

02/15/2019: Declaration of Jeffrey J Ward in Support of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Companys Discovery Motions filed

Declaration of Matthew S Jones in Support of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Companys Discovery Motions filed

02/15/2019: Declaration of Matthew S Jones in Support of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Companys Discovery Motions filed

Order for Request for Continuance is Denied and filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

02/20/2019: Order for Request for Continuance is Denied and filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

Order for Request for Continuance is Denied and filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

02/20/2019: Order for Request for Continuance is Denied and filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

Order for Request for Continuance is Denied and filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

02/20/2019: Order for Request for Continuance is Denied and filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

Order granting attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel filed. Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman. Attorney is relieved as counsel effective: upon filing of proof of service of signed order.

05/07/2019: Order granting attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel filed. Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman. Attorney is relieved as counsel effective: upon filing of proof of service of signed order.

Order granting attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel filed. Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman. Attorney is relieved as counsel effective: upon filing of proof of service of signed order.

05/07/2019: Order granting attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel filed. Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman. Attorney is relieved as counsel effective: upon filing of proof of service of signed order.

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY.

03/10/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY.

Amended Judgment to 1st Amended Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO filed 02/05/20; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

02/05/2020: Amended Judgment to 1st Amended Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO filed 02/05/20; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

Notice of Errata of the spelling of the name in (Proposed) Judgment by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed.

02/04/2020: Notice of Errata of the spelling of the name in (Proposed) Judgment by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed.

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.

01/30/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.

Judgment (partial) as to WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman - dispositioned case/party.

01/23/2020: Judgment (partial) as to WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman - dispositioned case/party.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) in the amount of $$1986.50 by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed.

01/08/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) in the amount of $$1986.50 by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed.

Notice of Ruling re: DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed

12/19/2019: Notice of Ruling re: DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed

Judgment (partial) as to ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING LLC, GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING LLC, EDWARD R STOLZ II filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman - dispositioned case/party.

12/16/2019: Judgment (partial) as to ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING LLC, GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING LLC, EDWARD R STOLZ II filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman - dispositioned case/party.

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Judgment on 1st Amended Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY

12/16/2019: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Judgment on 1st Amended Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re Order to Show Cause to Determine Service of Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing

12/16/2019: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re Order to Show Cause to Determine Service of Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing

454 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • HearingType: Court Trial - Long Cause; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY.; Filed By: WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amended Judgment to 1st Amended Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO filed 02/05/20; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Errata of the spelling of the name in (Proposed) Judgment by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed.; Filed By: WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.; Filed By: ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment (partial) as to WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman - dispositioned case/party.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) in the amount of $$1986.50 by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Ruling re: DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • HearingType: Hearing Re Order to Show Cause to Determine Service of Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Hearing Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Judgment on 1st Amended Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO by WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Hearing Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
476 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketFilings: Cross Complaint of ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition: Complete 11/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO as to WEINGARTEN & HOUGH INSURANCE AGENCY; mailing date of 07/19/18 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO served on LEILANI JOY BERNARDO with service date of 07/19/18 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO served on ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with service date of 07/16/18 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/10/2018; Fine Description: Master Card Receipt No.: CV180710-0078-MC.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATIO and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92260.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less