This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 14:16:53 (UTC).

ROSS vs WALMART INC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 ROSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3358

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WALMART INC

PENNZOIL - QUAKER STATE COMPANY

METALINE PRODUCTS COMPANY INC

THE HOWARD COMPANY INC

METALINE PRODUCTS CO., INC

THE HOWARD COMPANY, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAKKABI LAW GROUP

Attorney at MAKKABI LAW GROUP

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROPERS MAJESKI PC

Attorney at ROPERS MAJESKI PC

CLAUSEN MILLER PC

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC

Danielle D. Mittskus

Stanley Ratcliffe Escalante

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

09/28/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Case Management Statement on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

09/21/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

09/20/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Case Management Statement

09/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of change of address on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

09/14/2021: Notice of change of address on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

Notice of Document Return.

09/14/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

07/29/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Proof of Service on Cross Complaint of PENNZOIL - QUAKER STATE COMPANY

05/11/2021: Proof of Service on Cross Complaint of PENNZOIL - QUAKER STATE COMPANY

Certificate of Mailing

05/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

05/28/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Proof of Service on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

04/30/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

05/10/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Cross-Defendant The Howard Company, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint of Pennzoil-Quaker State Company on Cross Complaint of PENNZOIL - QUAKER STATE COMPANY

05/10/2021: Cross-Defendant The Howard Company, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint of Pennzoil-Quaker State Company on Cross Complaint of PENNZOIL - QUAKER STATE COMPANY

Defendant The Howard Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff Janaki Durgiah Ross' Complaint on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

05/10/2021: Defendant The Howard Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff Janaki Durgiah Ross' Complaint on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

Notice of Change of Address

04/20/2021: Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Document Return.

04/22/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal

04/07/2021: Request for Dismissal

Third Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

03/15/2021: Third Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS; Filed By: WALMART INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20210920-00751.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement; Filed By: THE HOWARD COMPANY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of change of address on Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS; Filed By: WALMART INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of ROSS by WALMART INC represented by ROPERS MAJESKI PC filed. (Over $25,000.00); Filed By: WALMART INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of ROSS as to PENNZOIL - QUAKER STATE COMPANY; mailing date of 09/09/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint of ROSS Naming Does 01 to be PENNZOIL - QUAKER STATE COMPANY filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/26/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2873 Receipt No.: CV200826-0188-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Ntc of Dept Assignmt for All Purposes and Ntc of CMC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92881.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of ROSS and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of JANAKI DURGIAH ROSS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNZOIL-QUAKER STATE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOWARD A. KAPP APLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITTSKUS DANIELLE