This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 10:43:20 (UTC).

ROMERO vs CARPENTER CO

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 ROMERO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CARPENTER CO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL A OTTOLIA and Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4557

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL A OTTOLIA

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIGUEL ROMERO

Defendants

CARPENTER CO

E.R. CARPENTER COMPANY

LILY MYRICK

CARPENTER

CARPENTER CO WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN LLP

Attorney at LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN LLP

8889 W. Olympic Blvd., Ste 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorney

MCGUIREWOODS LLP

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS LLP

1800 Century Park East 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1501

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

02/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

12/11/2020: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Amended Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

12/11/2020: Amended Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order: CARPENTER CO, CARPENTER CO WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFOR/MCGUIREWOODS LLP is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to appear 10/27/20 for Trial

12/11/2020: Minute Order: CARPENTER CO, CARPENTER CO WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFOR/MCGUIREWOODS LLP is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to appear 10/27/20 for Trial Setting Conf..

Trial Setting Order

12/11/2020: Trial Setting Order

AMENDMENT TO Trial Setting Order

12/11/2020: AMENDMENT TO Trial Setting Order

Declaration of Sylvia J.Kim in response to order to show cause re: failure to appear at trial setting conference

12/03/2020: Declaration of Sylvia J.Kim in response to order to show cause re: failure to appear at trial setting conference

Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND OSC RE SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT by MIGUEL ROMERO filed.

11/03/2020: Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND OSC RE SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT by MIGUEL ROMERO filed.

Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

10/27/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

06/29/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 06/29/20 at 8:30 in Department 4.

06/08/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 06/29/20 at 8:30 in Department 4.

System Generated Notice re: Clerks Certificate of mailings.

06/03/2020: System Generated Notice re: Clerks Certificate of mailings.

Answer to Complaint of ROMERO by CARPENTER CO WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFOR represented by MCGUIREWOODS LLP filed. (Over $25,000.00)

06/01/2020: Answer to Complaint of ROMERO by CARPENTER CO WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFOR represented by MCGUIREWOODS LLP filed. (Over $25,000.00)

Stipulation and Order for (JOINT) DISMISSING DEF LILY MYRICK W/PREJUDICE is Granted; Honorable Judge Daniel A Ottolia.

05/11/2020: Stipulation and Order for (JOINT) DISMISSING DEF LILY MYRICK W/PREJUDICE is Granted; Honorable Judge Daniel A Ottolia.

Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Honorable Judge Daniel A Ottolia.

03/23/2020: Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Honorable Judge Daniel A Ottolia.

Proof of Service of JOINT STIP served on LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN served 03/11/20 Filed (non-complaint)

03/23/2020: Proof of Service of JOINT STIP served on LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN served 03/11/20 Filed (non-complaint)

Stipulation (JOINT) STIP TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed.

03/23/2020: Stipulation (JOINT) STIP TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed.

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

03/02/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: MIGUEL ROMERO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • HearingType: CARPENTER CO, CARPENTER CO WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFOR/MCGUIREWOODS LLP is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to appear 10/27/20 for Trial Setting Conf..; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: CARPENTER CO, CARPENTER CO WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFOR/MCGUIREWOODS LLP is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to appear 10/27/20 for Trial Setting Conf..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Amended Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: AMENDMENT TO Trial Setting Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Trial Setting Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Sylvia J.Kim in response to order to show cause re: failure to appear at trial setting conference; Filed By: CARPENTER CO; CARPENTER CO WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND OSC RE SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT by MIGUEL ROMERO filed.; Filed By: MIGUEL ROMERO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of ROMERO by CARPENTER CO represented by MCGUIREWOODS LLP filed. (Over $25,000.00); Filed By: CARPENTER CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/07/2019; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #4190 Receipt No.: CV191021-0320-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/07/2019; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #4190 Receipt No.: CV191021-0276-FE.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/04/2019; Fine Description: Check #4142 Receipt No.: CV190904-0736-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of ROMERO and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of MIGUEL ROMERO; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 02/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E.R. CARPENTER COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CARPENTER is a litigant