This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 23:27:43 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ VS. WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING

Case Summary

On 02/16/2005 RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5846

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IRIS P KETELSEN

SEAN G CLARK

CAROLE PARKS

MANUEL J CARLOS

TERESA T CLARK

MICHAEL L HEATH

RICK D QUINLAN

MARIE E ESCOBAR

MARICHU N QUINLAN

JUDITH A PHILLIPS

Defendant

DR HORTON LOS ANGELES HOLDING COMPANY, INC.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ROYCON, INC

FOREST ROOFING CO INC

ROBERT LYNCH DESIGNS

MACKENZIE LANDSCAPE

MIDAS SERVICES INC

MIKE SCHIENKER MASONRY

LASCO BATHWARE INC

WESTERN INSULATIONINC

WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING-RIVERSIDE I, LLC

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SICKINGER, WILLIAM M

2155 Chicago Avenue, Suite 300

Riverside, CA 92507

Defendant Attorney

YUNKER & SCHNEIDER

655 West Broadway Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BOHL & WOHLGEMUTH

2300 Knoll Drive Suite N

Ventura, CA 93003-7388

Cross Defendant Attorneys

BOHL & ASSOCIATES

2300 Knoll Drive Suite N

Ventura, CA 93003-7388

GRAVES & KING LLP

500 North Blvd Suite 1850

Glendale, CA 91203

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

21700 Copley Dr, Ste 310

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

LAW OFFICES OF PONSOR & ASSOCIATES

1980 Orange Tree Lane Ste. 106

Redlands, CA 92374

LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

550 West C Street Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

CLEMENTS AND KNOCK, LLP

7825 Fay Avenue Suite 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Other Attorneys

BORTON PETIRINI & CONRON

290 North "D" St Suite 500

San Bernardino, CA 92401

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

One Mac Arthur Place Ste.650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

AVILA & PEROS LLP

19100 Von Karman Ave Ste 950

Irvine, CA 92612

LETOFSKY * MCLAIN

3655 Nobel Dr Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92122

LIEBMAN, QUIGLEY, SHEPPARD & SOULEMA

3255 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

ATKINSON, ANDELSONLOYA RUUD & ROMO

16870 West Bernardo Dr. #330

San Diego, CA 92127

KENNEDY & SOUZA APC

1230 Columbia Street Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

JEFFREY & GROSFELDLLP

725 Town & Country Road Suite 210

Orange, CA 92868

BREMER, WHYTE, BROWN O'MEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ NAMING DOES 1 TO BE DR HORTON LOS ANGELES HOLDING COMPANY, INC. FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ AS TO PLAINTIFF HUGO RODRIGUEZ, AURA D RODRIGUEZ FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISM

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISS CLASS ALLEGATIONS IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE STEPHEN D CUNNISON.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ SERVED ON DR HORTON LOS ANGELES HOLDING COMPANY, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/29/05 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ AS TO WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING -RIVERSIDE; MAILING DATE OF 04/30/05 FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ BY WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING -RIVERSIDE, DR HORTON LOS ANGELES HOLDING COMPANY, INC. REPRESENTED BY YUNKER & SCHNEIDER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ AS TO PLAINTIFF CHARLES C JOHNSON, GLORIA A JOHNSON FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HUGO RODRIGUEZ, AURA D RODRIGUEZ

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WESTERN PAC

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING -RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY YUNKER & SCHNEIDER FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING -RIVERSIDE, DR HORTON LOS ANGELES HOLDING COMPANY, INC.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/09/2005 OF WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING -RIVERSIDE AS TO MIKE SCHIENKER MASONRY; MAILING DATE OF 09/22/05 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/09/2005 OF WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING -RIVERSIDE AS TO ATI WINDOWS; MAILING DATE OF 09/22/05 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/09/2005 OF WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING -RIVERSIDE SERVED ON PETERSEN CONTRACTING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/27/05 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/09/2005 OF WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING -RIVERSIDE AS TO WESTERN INSULATIONINC; MAILING DATE OF 09/22/05 FILED.

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2011
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC FOR DESTRUCTION (DISMISSAL) IS SET 11/04/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. RIDST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; MINUTE ORDER; REASON - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, AS TO BORTON, PETRINI AND CONRON LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; MINUTE ORDER; REASON - ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN, AS TO MCMAHON TREACY LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketHEARING RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • DocketHEARING RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
238 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISS CLASS ALLEGATIONS IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE STEPHEN D CUNNISON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HRG COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ AS TO DOE DR HORTON LOS ANGELES HOLDING COMPANY, INC.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2005
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ AS TO PLAINTIFF HUGO RODRIGUEZ, AURA D RODRIGUEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2005 OF HUGO RODRIGUEZ NAMING DOES 1 TO BE DR HORTON LOS ANGELES HOLDING COMPANY, INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 01 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/18/05 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • DocketCOMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE POSTED BY HUGO RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MACKENZIE LANDSCAPE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ROYCON, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREST ROOFING CO., INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDAS SERVICES INC is a litigant