This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 14:58:08 (UTC).

RODGER ERICKSON VS INDIAN WELLS ACQUISITION

Case Summary

On 08/25/2015 RODGER ERICKSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INDIAN WELLS ACQUISITION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3968

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODGER ERICKSON

WILLIE LORENE GONIA

KATHERINE LEE

JOHN M LEE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

INDIAN WELLS ACQUISITION CORPORATION

CLUBCORP USA INC

CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC

IWCC ACQUISITION CORP

CLUBCORP HOLDINGS INC

STANLEY MORSE

SOUTH POINT CONSTRUCTION INC

MDS CONSULTING

MINISTRELLI DEVELOPMENT INC

NOES 1-100

LARRY E JOHNSON

Cave Creek, AZ 85331

BASELINE DEVELOPMENT CO

FEIRO ENGINEERING INC

MDS CONSULTING INC

LANCE CHRISTENSEN HOMES INC

JOHN CHRISTOPHER KRIEG

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIRARDI & KEESE

1126 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN& DICKER LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SAVIDGE, DAVID H

555 South Flower St Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

WEIL & DRAGE APC

23212 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

ANDERHOLT WHITTAKER LLP

73525 El Paseo Suite E-2516

Palm Desert, CA 92260

WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ,ELELMAN & DICKER

655 West Broadway Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

GURALNICK & GILLILAND

40004 Cook Street Suite 3

Palm Desert, CA 92211

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS HOOD

18915 Evening Breeze Circle

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL LLP

4365 Executive Dr #950

San Diego, CA 92121

Other Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN

9333 Fairway View Place #200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

4500 Pacific Coast Highway 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804-3298

BASSETT, DIS COE, MCMAINS & KARGOZAR

1551 North Tustin Avenue Suite 900

Santa Ana, CA 92705

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

1901 Orange Tree Lane #100

Redlands, CA 92374

WOODRUFF SPRADLIN & SMART

555 Anton Blvd #1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH

21031 Ventura Blvd #800

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MARC MAGID,

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MARC MAGID, SHANNON MAGID REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2016 OF CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC BY KENT B WOODARD, KATHERINE L STEWART REPRESENTED BY WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDI

OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY CLUB IW GOLF CLUB INC AND IWCC ACQUISTION CORP FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2016 OF CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC AS TO BASELINE DEVELOPMENT CO; MAILING DATE OF 09/02/16 FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER FILED BY MARC AND SHANNON MAGID FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KENT B WOODARD, KATHERINE L STEWART

FILED: STATUS REPORT OF CLUBCO

FILED: STATUS REPORT OF CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC & IWCC

FILED: WOODARD AND STEWARTS DE

FILED: WOODARD AND STEWARTS DECL IN ADVANCE OF 2/21/17 OSC HEARING RE DEFAULT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RODGER ERICKSON SERVED ON INDIAN WELLS ACQUISITION CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/19/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE TO RIC1

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE TO RIC1515398 BY CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC, CLUBCORP HOLDINGS INC FILED.

ORD GRNTG STIP TO DISM DEFT CL

ORD GRNTG STIP TO DISM DEFT CLUBCORP HOLDINGS INC W/O PREJ FILED ON 03/04/16 BY RODGER ERICKSON WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 03/17/16.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2016 OF CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC BY FEIRO ENGINEERING INC REPRESENTED BY ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FEIRO ENGINEERING INC

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2016 OF CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC AS TO KATHERINE L STEWART; MAILING DATE OF 04/19/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2016 OF CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC SERVED ON MARC MAGID WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE ON S

ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE ON SECRETARY OF STATE DENIED. HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KENT B WOODARD, KATHERINE L STEWART.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2016 OF CLUBCORP IW GOLF CLUB INC AS TO MARC MAGID WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/15/16

156 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION BY RODGER ERICKSON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 4/2/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: KENT B WOODARD AND KATHERINE STEWARTS STATUS UPDATE PRIOR TO 1/30/18 CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD ON 11/21/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY KENT B WOODARD, KATHERINE L STEWART FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
263 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RODGER ERICKSON, WILLIE LORENE GONIA, KATHERINE LEE, JOHN M LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RODGER ERICKSON SERVED ON INDIAN WELLS ACQUISITION CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/19/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RODGER ERICKSON SERVED ON CLUBCORP HOLDINGS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/13/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RODGER ERICKSON NAMING DOES 001 TO BE IWCC ACQUISITION CORP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RODGER ERICKSON FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92210.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less