This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/29/2020 at 00:23:59 (UTC).

ROBLES VS SHALHOUB MANAGEMENT CO INC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 ROBLES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHALHOUB MANAGEMENT CO INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7531

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICKY ROBLES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MCDONALDS CORPORATION

SHALHOUB MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

RICHARD SHALHOUB

WALMART INC

DNS2 MANAGEMENT LLC

REFRIGERATION CONTROL COMPANY INC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

REFRIGERATION CONTROL COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

8827 West Olympic Blvd

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-3613

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

11766 Wilshire Blvd 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA LUTZ & DOLIN PC

11622 El Camino Real Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

, SELMAN BREIT MAN

6 Hutton Centre Dr #1100

Santa Ana, CA 92707

SELMAN BREITMAN

6 Hutton Centre Drive Suite 1100

Santa Ana, CA 92707

GURNEE MASON RUSHFORD BONOTTO & FORESTIERE

2240 Douglas Blvd Ste 150

Roseville, CA 95661

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

GURNEE MASON RUSHFORD BONOTTO & FORESTIERE

2240 Douglas Blvd Ste 150

Roseville, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2019 OF DNS2 MANAGEMENT LLC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR GOOD

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENTS IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WALMART INC, DNS2 MANAGEMENT LLC

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER 9/10/19.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES REMOVE ATTORNEY PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA LUTZ & DOLIN PC FOR PARTY(S) WALMART INC AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY SELMAN BREIT MAN

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES BY REFRIGERATION CONTROL COMPANY INC REPRESENTED BY GURNEE MASON RUSHFORD BONOTTO &FORESTIERE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2019 OF DNS2 MANAGEMENT LLC AND FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 6/10/19.

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT ON

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT ON BEHALF OF DEFT WALMART INC BY WALMART INC FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES BY DNS2 MANAGEMENT LLC REPRESENTED BY SELMAN BREITMAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 1

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES NAMING DOES 01 TO BE DNS2 MANAGEMENT LLC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES AS TO DNS2 MANAGEMENT LLC; MAILING DATE OF 03/07/19 FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY SHALH

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY SHALHOUB MANAGEMENTCOMPANY INC, RICHARD SHALHOUB FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES AS TO SHALHOUB MANAGEMENTCOMPANY INC; MAILING DATE OF 12/10/18 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES SERVED ON MCDONALDS CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/13/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES SERVED ON WALMART INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92253.

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2019 OF DNS2 MANAGEMENT LLC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS RESCHEDULED TO 03/18/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO PS2 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 3/18/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES AS TO SHALHOUB MANAGEMENTCOMPANY INC; MAILING DATE OF 12/10/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketFAX FILING BY NICKY ROBLES ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES SERVED ON WALMART INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Docket--AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES SERVED ON WALMART INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/04/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92253.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2018 OF NICKY ROBLES AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less