This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/16/2018 at 21:42:16 (UTC).

ROBERTSONS READY MIX VS JACOBS CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 11/16/2017 ROBERTSONS READY MIX filed an Other lawsuit against JACOBS CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6427

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD

Defendants

JACOBS CONSTRUCTION

JOHN JACOBS

AMS PROPERTIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER B FUSELIER

200 S Main Street #200 Po Box 3600

Corona, CA 92882

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/16/2017 OF ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/17/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET 11/21/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacobs Constructors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 245 SPALDING PARTNERS L.P. DBA AMS PROPERTIES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant