This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/21/2020 at 00:29:17 (UTC).

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD VS JAY'S CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD filed an Other lawsuit against JAY'S CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2361

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD

Defendants

PARAMJIT SANDHU

JAY'S CONSTRUCTION

JASWINDER SINGH

NAVTEJ SANDHU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERVYN Y ENCARNACION

200 South Main St #200

Corona, CA 92882

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2020 OF ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD SERVED ON JASWINDER SINGH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/10/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: AS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - UNDER $10K FILED. (MORENO VALLEY)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2020 OF ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92506.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingDept: MV1; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingDept: CLEM; Action text: NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2020 OF ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD SERVED ON JASWINDER SINGH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/10/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 12/01/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. MV1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - UNDER $10K FILED. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 9/29/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2020 OF ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92506.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENCARNACION MERVYN YOUNG