Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/06/2018 at 03:01:01 (UTC).

ROBERTS & ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 ROBERTS ROBERTS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2392

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHERON CHRISTINE ROBERTS

Norco, CA 92860

Respondent

STEVEN BLISS ROBERTS

Not Classified By Court

RILEY AUSTIN ROBERTS

DOMINICK STEVEN ROBERTS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE ON SHERON CHRISTINE ROBERTS WITH MAILING DATE OF 07/15/17 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED BY STEVEN BLISS ROBERTS (FL-105/GC-120)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY STEVEN BLISS ROBERTS. (FL-150)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (RESPONDENT): 06/19/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RESIDENCE FILED BY STEVEN BLISS ROBERTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (RESPONDENT): 04/21/01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION, LEGAL SEPARATION, OR NULLITY FILED BY STEVEN BLISS ROBERTS, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.(FL-120)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION ON STEVEN BLISS ROBERTS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/23/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED UCCJEA, DECL OF DISCLOSURE, SCH OF ASSETS & DEBTS ON STEVEN BLISS ROBERTS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/23/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD(REN) FILED 06/19/2017 OF SHERON ROBERTS SERVED ON STEVEN BLISS ROBERTS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/23/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RESIDENCE FILED BY SHERON CHRISTINE ROBERTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 6/20/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 6/18/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 8/18/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD(REN) FILED 06/19/2017 OF SHERON ROBERTS (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • FAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 05/24/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE NORCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 04/21/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less