This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 06:14:12 (UTC).

RIVERSIDE RECOVERY VS FANCY VISIONS

Case Summary

On 11/23/2011 RIVERSIDE RECOVERY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FANCY VISIONS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8820

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT

FANCY VISIONS INTERNATIONAL INC

DESIGNS UNLIMITED INC

BERNARD L TRUAX II

SHARDON JACKSON

RORY SMITH

PHILLIP D OBERHANSLEY

DANIEL AYERS

JOE BUNDRA

CALDERON KERR

JOHN LEWAY

STEVE RAWLINGS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FANCY VISIONS INTERNATIONAL INC

DESIGNS UNLIMITED INC

JEWEL GRAFF

Hemet, CA 92543

ROBERT H MCNALLEN

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ROBERT H MCNALLEN

Hemet, CA 92543

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LIEBERG OBERHANSLEY & STROHMEYER

41911 Fifth St, Ste 300

Temecula, CA 92590

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR OR

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING RIVERSIDE CASE/SHORTENING TIME BY RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT FILED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ROBERT H MCNALLEN IS GRANTED; CLERK J KARNES (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CR

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CROSS COMPLAINT ON PHILLIP D OBERHANSLEY WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/27/11 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/27/2011 OF ROBERT MCNALLEN SERVED ON STEVE RAWLINGS FILED; DATE OF MAILING 12/27/11

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/27/2011 OF ROBERT MCNALLEN SERVED ON JOE BUNDRA FILED; DATE OF MAILING 12/27/11

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/23/2011 OF RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT AS TO FANCY VISIONS INTERNATIONAL INC, DESIGNS UNLIMITED INC FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/27/2011 OF ROBERT MCNALLEN AS TO BERNARD L TRUAX II, JOE BUNDRA, RORY SMITH, SHARDON JACKSON, DANIEL AYERS, PHILLIP D OBERHANSLEY, STEVE RAWLINGS, JOHN LEWAY, CALDERON KERR FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY R

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

DECLARATION OF OF PHILIP D OBE

DECLARATION OF OF PHILIP D OBERHANSLEY IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED FILED

DECLARATION OF OF CLARENDON KE

DECLARATION OF OF CLARENDON KEITH KERR IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED FILED

DECLARATION OF OF DANIEL AYERS

DECLARATION OF OF DANIEL AYERS IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MO

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH BY RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT FILED.

WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATED COUNS

WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATED COUNSEL FOR RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT

RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR RYAN

RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR RYAN D. MILLER AS TO CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; REASON RETURNED: BOX CLOSED/UNABLE TO FORWARD.

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON CROSS CO

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2013
  • OSC HEARING RE: SANCTIONS AS TO ALL PARTIES FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE TSC AS TO RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT, JEWEL GRAFF, ROBERT H MCNALLEN.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • FAX FILING BY RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • FAX FILING BY RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2011
  • MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE SET FOR 01/09/12 AT 09:00 IS CONFIRMED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES BY RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • FEE PAID FOR ON-LINE RESERVATION OF MOTION ($40.00). CONFIRMATION NUMBER RES5496 FOR HEARING RESERVED ON 01/09/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • HEARING RESERVED SET 01/09/12 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 12 - RES5496

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/23/2011 OF RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 12 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE HEC1103752 BY RIVERSIDE RECOVERYFACILITY MANAGEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less