This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/12/2020 at 00:55:39 (UTC).

RIDGE PARK VS NATIONAL MERCHANTS

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 RIDGE PARK filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against NATIONAL MERCHANTS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2011

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDGE PARK POINT, LLC

Defendant

NATIONAL MERCHANTSASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE AMIN LAW GROUP

2211 Michelson Drive Suite 1270

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES - UD.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER $25,000 (SOUTHWEST)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/17/2019 OF RIDGE PARK POINT, LLC AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIDGE PARK POINT, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY RIDGE PARK POINT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES - UD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIDGE PARK POINT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY ISMAIL AMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SUBMITTED BY RIDGE PARK POINT, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S101 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER $25,000 (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/17/2019 OF RIDGE PARK POINT, LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/17/19 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY RIDGE PARK POINT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Merchants Association, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant